This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2020 at 09:07:53 (UTC).

Hoffman v. M&T Bank Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Hoffman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against M T Bank Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03769

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chandel Richard Hoffman

Defendants

M&T Bank Corporation

Camping World Holdings, Inc.

Camping World of Harrisburg

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#6

#9

 

Docket Entries

12/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Chandel Richard Hoffman. (filed at the direction of chambers) (dsto, ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerks Office to Chandel Richard Hoffman, 168 Larch Avenue, Teaneck, NJ, 07666 (dsto, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case be transferred in the interests of justice to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania for further handling. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 11/17/2020. (dsto, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Chandel Richard Hoffman.(dsto, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Camping World Holdings, Inc., Camping World of Harrisburg, M&T Bank Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number SCX400014814), filed by Chandel Richard Hoffman. Service due by 1/25/2021.(dsto, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less