This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:28:06 (UTC).

Hoffman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Hoffman against Commissioner of Social Security in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New York Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01116

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Michael Hoffman

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rothstein on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Rothstein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number BUF065656. (KM) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as incomplete. Plaintiff states that he is no longer employed, receives government benefits, and that he resides with his father, girlfriend and girlfriend's daughter. Plaintiff does not any dependents. He also indicates that he father his pays all his bills, which he lists at $2200 per month without specifying exactly what expenses this figure represents. Plaintiff also does not indicate his father's income, therefore, based on the information provided, the Court cannot determine whether plaintiff has set forth sufficient indications of indigency. Thus, plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion is DENIED. Plaintiff has until September 25, 2019 to (1) re-file his application using the Court's standard form with all of the relevant information included, or (2) pay the $400.00 filing fee. If plaintiff has not complied with either of these options by September 25, 2019, the Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case without prejudice and without further order. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/26/2019. (NNR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 copy of complaint)(KLH) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (KLH) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frank Michael Hoffman.(Hiller, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Frank Michael Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hiller, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.