This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 08:41:08 (UTC).

Hofer et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Hofer filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00955

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kay Hofer

William Hofer

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Does 1-10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Blakely, Jr.

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

Robert Joseph Chambers, II

Attorney at Dixon Diab & Chambers LLP

501 West Broadway, Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

N. Kirkland Pope

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

R. Timothy Morrison

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

Post Office Box 19337

Atlanta, GA 31126-1337

Defendant Attorneys

Mayela C. Montenegro-Urch

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614-2546

Claire Martha Hillman

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Janet L. Hickson

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1600

Irvine, CA 92614-2546

Scott W. Sayler

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon, L.L.P.

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

 

Court Documents

#44

(#44) ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

42 #1

*Restricted*

#42

(#42) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Southern, case number 3:18-cv-01991. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

41 #1

MDL 2949 Transfer Order

#41

(#41) Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Arkansas*.*500 W. Capitol Ave.**Little Rock, AR 72201* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2949 Transfer Order) (jdt) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#40

(#40) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Enter Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case stayed until pending the outcome of Plaintiffs' counsel's Motion to Transfer all cases involving the Profemur Modular Hips Implant Stem to the Eastern District of Arkansas that has been filed with the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Civil Docket: MDL No. 2949. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/12/2020. (jrm) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

39 #10

Exhibit 10

39 #9

Exhibit 9

#39

(#39) Joint MOTION to Stay re #38 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Proof of Service)(Hickson, Janet) (jrm). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#8

(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627831 - See #4 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pope, N.) Modified text on 9/6/2018 to add filing fee info. (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#7

(#10) PRO HAC APPROVED re #7 : Michael J. Blakely, Jr appearing for Plaintiffs Kay Hofer, William Hofer. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#6

(#9) PRO HAC APPROVED re #6 : R. Timothy Morrison appearing for Plaintiffs Kay Hofer, William Hofer. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Hofer, Kay Hofer. DOES 1-10, Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served. (Chambers, Robert) (acc). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#4

(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627831 - See #4 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pope, N.) Modified text on 9/6/2018 to add filing fee info. (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#3

(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627783 - See #3 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Blakely, Michael) Modified text on 9/6/2018 to add filing fee info. (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #1

civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10, Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11605720.), filed by William Hofer, Kay Hofer. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01991-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Chambers, Robert)(jrm) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER UPON TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/9/2020. (jbh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docket(#43) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. The case of Hofer et al v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al, originally filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California and assigned case number 3:18-cv-01991, was transferred by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Arkansas and assigned to U.S. District Judge Kristine G. Baker as case number 4:20-cv-00955-KGB for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. The master case for this litigation is 4:20-md-2949-KGB. All counsel should request E-File Registration with the Eastern District of Arkansas through PACER. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/19/2020. (cmn) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Southern, case number 3:18-cv-01991. Copy of transfer order, case file, and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Arkansas. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Eastern District of Arkansas*.*500 W. Capitol Ave.**Little Rock, AR 72201* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2949 Transfer Order) (jdt) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Enter Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case stayed until pending the outcome of Plaintiffs' counsel's Motion to Transfer all cases involving the Profemur Modular Hips Implant Stem to the Eastern District of Arkansas that has been filed with the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Civil Docket: MDL No. 2949. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/12/2020. (jrm) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Joint MOTION to Stay re #38 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Proof of Service)(Hickson, Janet) (jrm). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/15/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/30/2020. (sjt) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION to Amend/Correct #28 Scheduling Order, by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Montenegro, Mayela) (jrm). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Claire M. Hillman, re #34 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/27/2020.(rmc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Scott W. Sayler, re #33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/23/2020.(rmc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRO HAC APPROVED re #7 : Michael J. Blakely, Jr appearing for Plaintiffs Kay Hofer, William Hofer. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PRO HAC APPROVED re #6 : R. Timothy Morrison appearing for Plaintiffs Kay Hofer, William Hofer. (no document attached) (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627831 - See #4 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pope, N.) Modified text on 9/6/2018 to add filing fee info. (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627783 - See #3 ). (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Blakely, Michael) Modified text on 9/6/2018 to add filing fee info. (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11636237.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Morrison, R.) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Hofer, Kay Hofer. DOES 1-10, Wright Medical Technology, Inc. served. (Chambers, Robert) (acc). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627831.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Pope, N.)QC email sent re: missing signature. (dsn) 9/6/2018 - Refiled as #8 . (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11627783.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Blakely, Michael) QC email sent re: missing signatures (dsn). 9/6/2018 - Refiled as #7 . (mdc) [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10, Wright Medical Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11605720.), filed by William Hofer, Kay Hofer. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-01991-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Chambers, Robert)(jrm) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mayela C Montenegro-Urch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet L Hickson