This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 17:25:36 (UTC).

HOEFLING et al v. ALTRIA GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 HOEFLING filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against ALTRIA GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JAN E. DUBOIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03847

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAN E. DUBOIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN J. "GUS" HOEFLING

MARGARET HOEFLING

Defendants

SWEDISH MATCH USA, INC.

ALTRIA GROUP, INC.

PACKER PARK PHARMACY CO.

U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC

PINKERTON TOBACCO CO. LP,

PACKER PARK PHARMACY CO. doing business as PACKER PARK APOTHECARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JACK MEYERSON

Attorney at MEYERSON & O'NEILL

1700 Market Street, Suite 3025

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DEBORA A. O'NEILL

Attorney at MEYERSON & O'NEILL

1600 Market Street., Ste 1305

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTINE O. BOYD

Attorney at LAVIN O'NEIL RICCI CEDRONE & DISIPIO

6Th & Race Sts, Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

JOHN M. LYONS

Attorney at Shook, Hary & Bacon L.L.P.

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St., Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON LLP

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market St Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7014

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

17 #3

Text of Proposed Order

17 #2

Certificate of Service

17 #1

Memorandum

#17

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Memorandum

#16

3 #5

Exhibit D

3 #4

Exhibit C

3 #3

Exhibit B

#2

1 #4

Case Management Track

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Coversheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by JOHN J. "GUS" HOEFLING, MARGARET HOEFLING. (O'NEILL, DEBORA) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN J. "GUS" HOEFLING, MARGARET HOEFLING. (O'NEILL, DEBORA) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT PINKERTON TOBACCO CO.LP'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANT PINKERTON TOBACCO CO., LP'S MOTION ON OR BEFORE 10/21/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 10/15/19. 10/15/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN J. "GUS" HOEFLING, MARGARET HOEFLING.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(MEYERSON, JACK) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLAI ANDREW SCHURKO on behalf of U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC with Certificate of Service(SCHURKO, NICOLAI) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(LYONS, JOHN) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Dismiss filed by PINKERTON TOBACCO CO. LP,.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Pinkerton Tobacco Co., LLC and Swedish Match Leaf Tobacco Company by PINKERTON TOBACCO CO. LP,.(BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE O. BOYD on behalf of PINKERTON TOBACCO CO. LP, with Certificate of Service(BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against PINKERTON TOBACCO CO. LP,, U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC, filed by JOHN J. "GUS" HOEFLING, MARGARET HOEFLING, JURY DEMAND, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jl, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by JOHN J. "GUS" HOEFLING, MARGARET HOEFLING. Amendment to #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant PACKER PARK PHARMACY CO. d/b/a PACKER PARK APOTHECARY. (MEYERSON, JACK) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To Defendant Packer Park Pharmacy Co. d/b/a Packer Park Apothecary(MEYERSON, JACK) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by SWEDISH MATCH USA, INC. re #4 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Swedish Match AB by SWEDISH MATCH USA, INC..(BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE O. BOYD on behalf of SWEDISH MATCH USA, INC. with Certificate of Service(BOYD, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number AUGUST 2019 NO.2642., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A, #2 EXHIBIT B, #3 EXHIBIT C, #4 EXHIBIT D, #5 EXHIBIT E, #6 EXHIBIT F, #7 EXHIBIT G, #8 EXHIBIT H, #9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(jl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC. . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H). (FILED IN ERROR; ATTORNEY SHALL RE-FILE ORIGINAL SIGNED HARD COPY WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE). (LYONS, JOHN) Modified on 9/5/2019 (fb). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent ALTRIA GROUP, INC., Corporate Parent UST, LLC, Corporate Parent ALTRIA ENTERPRISES II, LLC for U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC. with Certificate of Service by U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC.(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Demand for Trial by Jury(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal filed by U.S. SMOKELESS TOBACCO COMPANY, LLC from Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number Aug 2019 No. 2642. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE202571), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Coversheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track)(mbh, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinkerton Tobacco Co., LP is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Altria Group, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACK MEYERSON