This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/19/2020 at 08:35:40 (UTC).

Hodson v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/20/2020 Hodson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00052

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Brian Morris

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily J. Hodson

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael L. Rausch

Attorney at BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN, P.C. - HELENA

800 N. Last Chance Gulch Suie 101, Po Box 1697

Helena, MT 59624-1697

Steven John Fitzpatrick

Attorney at BROWNING KALECZYC BERRY & HOVEN P.C. - GREAT FALLS

Liberty Center, Suite 302, 9 Third Street North

Great Falls, MT 59401

Defendant Attorneys

Kaitlyn J. McArthur

Attorney at SMITH OBLANDER & MEADE, P.C.

104 2Nd Street South, Suite 400, Po Box 2685

Great Falls, MT 59403-2685

Stephanie A. Oblander

Attorney at SMITH OBLANDER & MEADE, P.C.

104 2Nd Street South, Suite 400, Po Box 2685

Great Falls, MT 59403-2685

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

5 #4

Issued Summons - Allstate

5 #3

Summons Return Served - Allstate

5 #2

Notice of Removal

5 #1

State Court Docket Sheet

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Policy Docs

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Service of Process

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John Johnston (ACC) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENTS TO USMJ. (ACC) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketRemark: Original State Court documents from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, placed in brown expando on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (ACC) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Emily J. Hodson. (ACC) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Summons Return Served - Allstate, #4 Issued Summons - Allstate) (ACC) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electroncially mailed to counsel Stephanie A. Oblander, Kaitlyn J. McArthur, Michael L. Rausch, Steven John Fitzpatrick. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 7/20/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2498683 (ACC) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number BDV-20-0286. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Service of Process, #3 Exhibit 3 - Issued Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 5 - Policy Docs, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaitlyn J. McArthur

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie A. Oblander