This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2019 at 07:55:43 (UTC).

Hodgson, Micheal v. Wisconsin Central, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Hodgson, Micheal filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Wisconsin Central, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Micheal R. Hodgson

Defendant

Wisconsin Central, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cortney S. Leneave

Attorney at Hunegs, LeNeave & Kvas, P.A.

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Ste. 101

Wayzata, MN 55391-4704

Thomas William Fuller

Attorney at Hunegs, LeNeave & Kvas, P.A.

1000 Twelve Oaks Center Drive, Ste. 101

Wayzata, MN 55391-4704

Defendant Attorneys

James D. Helenhouse

Attorney at Fletcher & Sippel LLC

29 North Wacker Drive, Suite 920

Chicago, IL 60606-2832

Brandon McArthur Thompson

Attorney at Fletcher & Sippel LLC

29 North Wacker Drive, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606-3208

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas William Fuller for Plaintiff Micheal R. Hodgson. (Fuller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#11

(#11) Amended ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#10

(#10) Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon McArthur Thompson for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Thompson, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#7

(#7) Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by James D. Helenhouse for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Micheal R. Hodgson. (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wisconsin Central, Ltd. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central, Ltd., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2388016.), filed by Micheal R. Hodgson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas William Fuller for Plaintiff Micheal R. Hodgson. (Fuller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Amended ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Appearance filed by Brandon McArthur Thompson for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Thompson, Brandon) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jat) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Demand for Trial by Jury by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by James D. Helenhouse for Defendant Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (Helenhouse, James) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Micheal R. Hodgson. (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Wisconsin Central, Ltd. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central, Ltd. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central, Ltd., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2388016.), filed by Micheal R. Hodgson, (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Leneave, Cortney) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.