This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2020 at 07:26:23 (UTC).

Hodgkins et al v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 Hodgkins filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Frontier Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Raymond P. Moore and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03469

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raymond P. Moore

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Renee Schwartzkopf

Heather Crowe

Melissa Hodgkins

Stacy Rewitzer

Defendant

Frontier Airlines, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lani A. Perlman

Galen Leigh Sherwin

Jayme Jonat

Sara R. Neel

Vincent Gregory Levy

Mark Silverstein

Juno E. Turner

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Ashley Webber

Danielle L. Kitson

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#21

#20

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#11

8 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/7/2020. Status Conference set for 2/10/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, ) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/4/2020. Frontier Airlines, Inc. answer due 3/11/2020. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 3/19/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(tsher, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM regarding #21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Pre-Conference Deadlines filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/4/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Reset Scheduling Conference and Extend Pre-Conference Deadlines by Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Hodgkins, Heather Crowe, Renee Schwartzkopf, Stacy Rewitzer. Frontier Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Perlman, Lani) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #17 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Danielle L. Kitson for Erin A. Webber. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Danielle L. Kitson by Danielle L. Kitson on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Erin A. Webber by Danielle L. Kitson on behalf of Frontier Airlines, Inc.Attorney Danielle L. Kitson added to party Frontier Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kitson, Danielle) (Entered: 12/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Mark Silverstein by Mark Silverstein on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Juno Turner by Juno E. Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Juno E. Turner added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Juno E. Turner added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Juno E. Turner added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Juno E. Turner added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla) (Turner, Juno) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/10/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 12/10/2019. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Galen Leigh Sherwin on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Galen Leigh Sherwin added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla) (Sherwin, Galen) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lani A. Perlman on behalf of Heather Crowe, Melissa Hodgkins, Stacy Rewitzer, Renee SchwartzkopfAttorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Lani A. Perlman added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla) (Perlman, Lani) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vincent Gregory Levy on behalf of Heather Crowe, Melissa Hodgkins, Stacy Rewitzer, Renee SchwartzkopfAttorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Vincent Gregory Levy added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla) (Levy, Vincent) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jayme Jonat on behalf of Heather Crowe, Melissa Hodgkins, Stacy Rewitzer, Renee SchwartzkopfAttorney Jayme Jonat added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Jayme Jonat added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Jayme Jonat added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Jayme Jonat added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla) (Jonat, Jayme) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Sara R. Neel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Neel, Sara) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7036821)Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Heather Crowe(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Melissa Hodgkins(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Stacy Rewitzer(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Renee Schwartzkopf(pty:pla), filed by Melissa Hodgkins, Heather Crowe, Renee Schwartzkopf, Stacy Rewitzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Neel, Sara) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less