This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2020 at 08:44:20 (UTC).

Jeffrey Hodges et al v. Federal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Jeffrey Hodges filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01896

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey Hodges

Kelli Elverum

Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenn R Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Jordon Edward Harriman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rebecca R Weinreich

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

CV11C

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:20-cv-01896-JVS-JDEx. (aco) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rebecca R Weinreich on behalf of Defendant Federal Insurance Company (Weinreich, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company, identifying Chubb Limited. (Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Federal Insurance Company.(Attorney Jordon Edward Harriman added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Harriman, Jordon) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Hodges, Kelli Elverum, upon Defendant Federal Insurance Company served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving Daisy Montenegro - Authorized Agent in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Federal Insurance Company. (esa) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kelli Elverum, Jeffrey Hodges. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kelli Elverum, Jeffrey Hodges. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28335147 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey Hodges, Kelli Elverum. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Kelli Elverum(pty:pla), Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Jeffrey Hodges(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordon Edward Harriman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca R Weinreich