This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 11:04:05 (UTC).

Hodge v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Hodge filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vanessa D Gilmore and Christina A Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02088

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

Referral Judge

Christina A Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessie Kelly Hodge

Defendants

The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America

U.S. Well Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffery B Kaiser

Attorney at Kaiser P.C.

2211 Norfolk, Ste 528

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

William B Wahlheim, Jr

Attorney at Maynard Cooper et al

1901 Sixth Avenue N, Ste 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Stephen Clark Jackson

Attorney at Maynard Cooper Gale PC

1901 6Th Ave N, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury and granting Plaintiff's leave to amend - Request is part of #13 Response to Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Dismiss Certain State Court Claims Without Prejudice. It is ORDERED that the following claims plead by Plaintiff in the removed state court lawsuit referenced above are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: (a) Negligence, (b) Gross negligence, (c) Negligence per se, (d)Negligent misrepresentation, (e)Breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing, (f) Violations of the Texas Insurance Code, (g)Violations of the Texas Deceptive Practices Act; and (h) Punitive and extra-contractual damages. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend State Court P

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury filed by Jessie Kelly Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend State Court Petition to Allege ERISA Claims)(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

12 #1

Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Certain State Court C

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Certain State Court Claims Without Prejudice by Jessie Kelly Hodge, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Certain State Court Claims Without Prejudice)(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. (Responses due by 7/31/2020 re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs State Law Claims, Claims for Punitive and Extra-Contractual Damages, and to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to ERISA, [Doc. 7] by Jessie Kelly Hodge, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, U.S. Well Services, LLC, filed.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jessie Kelly Hodge, filed.(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

7 #4

Proposed Order

7 #3

Exhibit B Policy

7 #2

Exhibit A Booklet

7 #1

Exhibit Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, U.S. Well Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Booklet, #3 Exhibit B Policy, #4 Proposed Order)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for William Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury and granting Plaintiff's leave to amend - Request is part of #13 Response to Motion to Dismiss. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Dismiss Certain State Court Claims Without Prejudice. It is ORDERED that the following claims plead by Plaintiff in the removed state court lawsuit referenced above are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: (a) Negligence, (b) Gross negligence, (c) Negligence per se, (d)Negligent misrepresentation, (e)Breach of the duty of good faith and fair dealing, (f) Violations of the Texas Insurance Code, (g)Violations of the Texas Deceptive Practices Act; and (h) Punitive and extra-contractual damages. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury filed by Jessie Kelly Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend State Court Petition to Allege ERISA Claims)(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Certain State Court Claims Without Prejudice by Jessie Kelly Hodge, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Certain State Court Claims Without Prejudice)(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. (Responses due by 7/31/2020 re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs State Law Claims, Claims for Punitive and Extra-Contractual Damages, and to Strike Demand for Jury Trial Pursuant to ERISA, [Doc. 7] by Jessie Kelly Hodge, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, U.S. Well Services, LLC, filed.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jessie Kelly Hodge, filed.(Kaiser, Jeffery) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's State-Law Claims and to Strike Demand for Jury by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, U.S. Well Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Booklet, #3 Exhibit B Policy, #4 Proposed Order)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for William Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, U.S. Well Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Oath, #2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America 6/29/2020; U.S. Well Services, LLC 6/29/2020.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, U.S. Well Services, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Harris County, case number 2020-29297 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24797789) filed by U.S. Well Services, LLC, The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Index of Matter, #3 Exhibit B Circuit Court Docket, #4 Exhibit C State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit D Executed Process, #6 Exhibit E List of Counsel of Record, #7 Exhibit F Policy, #8 Exhibit G Booklet to Policy)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S WELL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Clark Jackson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Bernhart Wahlheim, Jr.