This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:57:56 (UTC).

Hobson v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Hobson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cynthia R Wyrick and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00223

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lori Hobson

Defendant

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue, Suite 300

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Brent S Snyder

Attorney at Banks & Jones

2125 Middlebrook Pike

Knoxville, TN 37921

Defendant Attorney

Jeremy L. Retherford

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4168321.), filed by Lori Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Letter, #2 Other cover sheet, #3 Summons MCM)(Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit Collection Letter

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4170878.) by Lori Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Other Cert of good standing)(Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

1 #3

Summons MCM

7 #1

Other Cert of good standing

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Yitzchak Zelman) (AMP) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #2

Other cover sheet

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Hobson. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 1/16/2020. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in information will be circulated via e-mail. Please disregard any references in the attachment to in-person attendance.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/28/2020. (CMH) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Stipulated) by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Retherford, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Yitzchak Zelman. Notice serviced by mail. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/31/2020, at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Dial-in information will be circulated via e-mail. Please disregard any references in the attachment to in-person attendance.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/28/2020. (CMH) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Stipulated) by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Retherford, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Hobson. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 1/16/2020. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/27/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Yitzchak Zelman) (AMP) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for attorney Yitzchak Zelman regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4170878.) filed by Lori Hobson (JCK) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4170878.) by Lori Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Other Cert of good standing)(Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Attorney Yitzchak Zelman. Notice serviced by mail. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/20/19. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (GRE) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4168321.), filed by Lori Hobson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Letter, #2 Other cover sheet, #3 Summons MCM)(Snyder, Brent) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.