This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 07:02:15 (UTC).

HKA Enterprises LLC v. Superior Cranes Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 HKA Enterprises LLC filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Superior Cranes Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-03600

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HKA Enterprises LLC

HKA Enterprises Inc

Defendants

Superior Cranes Inc

Superior Industrial Contractors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E Weatherholtz

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

5 Exchange Street, Po Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402

Robert Andrew Walden

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson US LLP

5 Exchange Street, Po Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402

Defendant Attorney

Kevin A Dunlap

Attorney at Parker Poe Adams and Bernstein

100 Dunbar Street, Suite 206

Spartanburg, SC 29306

 

Court Documents

13 #5

Exhibit E - SIC Website Page

13 #4

Exhibit D - SC JEDA Article

13 #3

Exhibit C - SIC Latest News

13 #2

Exhibit B - Email from Dan Daly

13 #1

Exhibit A - Rowland Affidavit

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by HKA Enterprises LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rowland Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Dan Daly, #3 Exhibit C - SIC Latest News, #4 Exhibit D - SC JEDA Article, #5 Exhibit E - SIC Website Page)(Weatherholtz, James) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#10

(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by HKA Enterprises LLC.(Weatherholtz, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 2/20/2020 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/7/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/27/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/23/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/5/2020, Discovery due by 7/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 9/3/2020, Motions due by 7/20/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/5/2020, Mediation Due by 8/3/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/7/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dan W. Daly

7 #1

Memo in Support Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Superior Industrial Contractors LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dan W. Daly)No proposed order.(Dunlap, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Superior Cranes Inc (Dunlap, Kevin) Modified on 1/3/2020 to remove incorrect filer (alew, ). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Superior Cranes Inc, Superior Industrial Contractors LLC.(alew, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-04018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8854033), filed by Superior Industrial Contractors LLC, Superior Cranes Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 4/1/2020 11:00 AM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. (alew, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#16) DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 16 Reason: documents should not have been filed with the court, only served between the parties. (alew, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry: : The Court held a telephonic Rule 16 conference with the parties. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Amended Scheduling Order and responses to Local Rule 26.03 interrogatories within 14 days. Proceedings held before Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr: (alew, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response filed by HKA Enterprises LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/7/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rowland Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Dan Daly, #3 Exhibit C - SIC Latest News, #4 Exhibit D - SC JEDA Article, #5 Exhibit E - SIC Website Page)(Weatherholtz, James) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response to Motion due by 2/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/17/20.(alew, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by HKA Enterprises LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Weatherholtz, James) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by HKA Enterprises LLC.(Weatherholtz, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE for 2/20/2020 10:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/7/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/27/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/23/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/5/2020, Discovery due by 7/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 9/3/2020, Motions due by 7/20/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/14/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/5/2020, Mediation Due by 8/3/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/7/2020. (abuc) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Superior Industrial Contractors LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Dan W. Daly)No proposed order.(Dunlap, Kevin) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Superior Cranes Inc (Dunlap, Kevin) Modified on 1/3/2020 to remove incorrect filer (alew, ). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 1/14/2020. (alew, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Superior Cranes Inc, Superior Industrial Contractors LLC.(alew, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-42-04018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8854033), filed by Superior Industrial Contractors LLC, Superior Cranes Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HKA Enterprises LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E Weatherholtz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Andrew Walden