This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2019 at 09:29:35 (UTC).

H.J. HEINZ COMPANY BRANDS LLC v. REAL GOOD FOOD COMPANY, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 H J HEINZ COMPANY BRANDS LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against REAL GOOD FOOD COMPANY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia Reed Eddy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00915

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cynthia Reed Eddy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H.J. HEINZ COMPANY BRANDS LLC

Defendant

REAL GOOD FOOD COMPANY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christina T. Tellado

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

400 South Hope Street, Fl 8

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/31/2019. (sms) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

4 #10

Disclosure Statement

4 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

4 #8

Exhibit G

4 #7

Exhibit F

4 #6

Exhibit E

4 #5

Exhibit D

4 #4

Exhibit C

4 #3

Exhibit B

4 #2

Exhibit A

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Disclosure Statement) (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to REAL GOOD FOOD COMPANY, LLC (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement identifying THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY as corporate parent or other affiliate, by H.J. HEINZ COMPANY BRANDS LLC. (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/31/2019. (sms) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Disclosure Statement) (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to REAL GOOD FOOD COMPANY, LLC (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement identifying THE KRAFT HEINZ COMPANY as corporate parent or other affiliate, by H.J. HEINZ COMPANY BRANDS LLC. (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against REAL GOOD FOOD COMPANY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5225517), filed by H.J. HEINZ COMPANY BRANDS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons) (mao) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less