This case was last updated from PACER on 06/12/2020 at 13:15:25 (UTC).

Hitsman v. Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 Hitsman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Hitsman

Defendants

Amber Lolita Russell

Grayson, GA 30017

Evolution Asset Group LLC

Fairview Mediation Group Inc

Cassandra Catherine Cooper

Grayson, GA 30017

Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr.

Grayson, GA 30017

Hardy & Associates Inc.

Service Gurus Co.

Black Jockey Company

Jahaan Abdul McDuffie

Grayson, GA 30017

Benny H. Hardy, Jr.

Impact Solutions Group LLC

Hood & Thompson Inc

Walter D. Hargrove

Tonisa Micole Hodge

Donald Anthony Smiley

Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc

Lamar D. Snow

Demetrious Eugene Thompson

Sindi Acquisitions Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip C. Rogers

6140 28Th St. Se, Ste. 115

Grand Rapids, MI 49546-6938

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#12

(#12) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Benny H. Hardy, Jr (mg) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

11 #2

Proposed Document Entry of Default

11 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers

#11

(#11) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Benny H. Hardy Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Benny H. Hardy, Jr served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Cassandra Catherine Cooper; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Jahaan Abdul McDuffie; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Amber Lolita Russell; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Black Jockey Company, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Service Gurus Co.; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #4

Exhibit D

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Benny H. Hardy, Jr (mg) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Benny H. Hardy Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Black Jockey Company, Service Gurus Co., Lamont Darnell Cooper, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, and Amber Lolita Russell (mg) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #5 , #6 , #7 , and #8 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Benny H. Hardy, Jr served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Cassandra Catherine Cooper; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Jahaan Abdul McDuffie; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Amber Lolita Russell; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Black Jockey Company, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Service Gurus Co.; (mg) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Black Jockey Company, Cassandra Catherine Cooper, Lamont Darnell Cooper, Jr, Evolution Asset Group LLC, Fairview Mediation Group Inc, Global Management Acquisition Firm Inc, Benny H. Hardy, Jr, Hardy & Associates Inc., Walter D. Hargrove, Tonisa Micole Hodge, Hood & Thompson Inc, Impact Solutions Group LLC, Jahaan Abdul McDuffie, Amber Lolita Russell, Service Gurus Co., Sindi Acquisitions Inc, Donald Anthony Smiley, Lamar D. Snow, Demetrious Eugene Thompson (mg) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jack Hitsman in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5126550 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jack Hitsman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL MANAGEMENT ACQUISITION FIRM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip C. Rogers