This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:48:40 (UTC).

Hitsman v. Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 Hitsman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00207

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jack Hitsman

Defendants

Precious Grace Kelly

Charlotte, NC 28269

Manuel Menal Strong

Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC

Precious Grace Stephens

Charlotte, NC 28269

Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC

Atlantic Solutions Group LLC

D'Juan Dale Leverette

Charlotte, NC 28269

Jonathan Joel Dimusto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillip C. Rogers

6140 28Th St. Se, Ste. 115

Grand Rapids, MI 49546-6938

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Precious Grace Kelly and D'Juan Dale Leverette (pjw) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#33

(#33) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (pjw) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

32 #2

Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court proposed entry of default

32 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers

#32

(#32) APPLICATION for entry of default as to DJuan Dale Leverette, Precious Grace Kelly, a/k/a Precious Grace Stephens, and Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court proposed entry of default) (Rogers, Phillip) Modified text on 6/25/2019 and 6/26/2019 (pjw). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#31

(#31) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC (pjw) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

30 #2

Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Entry of Default

30 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers

#30

(#30) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC and Atlantic Solutions Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#9

(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #8 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#8

(#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #8 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Precious Grace Kelly served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS returned executed; D'Juan Dale Leverette served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC, Precious Grace Kelly, D'Juan Dale Leverette, Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC, Manuel Menal Strong (ems) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

#1

FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jack Hitsman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4390056 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Default (Entry of) #34 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Precious Grace Kelly and D'Juan Dale Leverette (pjw) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Default (Entry of) #33 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (pjw) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) APPLICATION for entry of default as to DJuan Dale Leverette, Precious Grace Kelly, a/k/a Precious Grace Stephens, and Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court proposed entry of default) (Rogers, Phillip) Modified text on 6/25/2019 and 6/26/2019 (pjw). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Default (Entry of) #31 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC (pjw) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC and Atlantic Solutions Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Phillip C. Rogers, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Entry of Default) (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Default #29 sent via U.S. Mail to D'Juan Dale Leverette and Precious Grace Kelly (pjw) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Manuel Menal Strong (pjw) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #8 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS returned executed; Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS returned executed; Precious Grace Kelly served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS returned executed; D'Juan Dale Leverette served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Atlantic Mediation Group, LLC, Atlantic Solutions Group LLC, Precious Grace Kelly, D'Juan Dale Leverette, Precious Health and Wellness Spa, LLC, Manuel Menal Strong (ems) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jack Hitsman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4390056 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jack Hitsman (Rogers, Phillip) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less