This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:14:08 (UTC).

Hitel Technologies LLC v. James Avery Craftsman, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Hitel Technologies LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against James Avery Craftsman, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00205

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hitel Technologies LLC

Defendant

James Avery Craftsman, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 2000

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Adil Anjum Shaikh

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suit 5000

Dallas, TX 75202

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish & Richardson, PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 50000

Dallas, TX 75201

Ricardo Joel Bonilla

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15758500), filed by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to James Avery Craftsman, Inc.. (jc5) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by James Avery Craftsman, Inc. re #1 Complaint (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: James Avery Craftsman, Inc. answer due 5/2/2022. (lad) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by James Avery Craftsman, Inc. re #1 Complaint (McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to James Avery Craftsman, Inc.. (jc5) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jc5) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15758500), filed by Hitel Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where James Avery Craftsman, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Hitel Technologies LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adil Anjum Shaikh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay