This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2023 at 06:32:36 (UTC).

Hitchcock v. Brody et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Hitchcock filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Brody. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02100

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher P. Hitchcock

Defendants

Efraim Brody

Gitel Braude

Gary M. Waxman

Diane R. Waxman

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc

Huntington National Bank

General Electric Capital Corporation

U.S. Department of Justice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristen K. Rine

Attorney at Office of the Prosecuting Attorney - Geauga County

3Rd Floor, 231 Main Street

Chardon, OH 44024

Defendant Attorneys

Mark A. Ziccarelli

Attorney at Ziccarelli & Martello - Mentor

8754 Mentor Avenue

Mentor, OH 44060

Jeremy A. Rill

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice - Tax Division

P.O. Box 14198

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint

1 #3

Appendix State Court Filings

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 27, 2023 to answer Complaint in Foreclosure with memorandum filed by Defendant U.A. Department of Justice. (Rill, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Gary M. Waxman, Efraim Brody, Gitel Braude, Diane R. Waxman. (Ziccarelli, Mark) Modified on 12/5/2022 (L,Br). (Entered: 12/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Gary M. Waxman, Efraim Brody, Gitel Braude, Diane R. Waxman. (Ziccarelli, Mark) Modified on 12/5/2022 (L,Br). (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Government's #3 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 27, 2023 to answer Complaint in Foreclosure. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 11/22/2022.(L,Ja) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 27, 2023 to answer Complaint in Foreclosure with memorandum filed by Defendant U.A. Department of Justice. (Rill, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,MI) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (L,MI) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketJudge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Geauga County Court of Common Pleas, case number 22F000611 . Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Appendix State Court Filings) (Rill, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huntington National Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where General Electric International Operations Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy A. Rill