This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2019 at 07:29:42 (UTC).

Hitchcock Independent School District v. Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 Hitchcock Independent School District filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hitchcock Independent School District

Defendants

Taun Pareek

International Insurance Company of Hannover

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London

Lexington Insurance Company

Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company

Tom McCartney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shaun Wesley Hodge

Attorney at Hodge Law Firm PLLC

2211 The Strand, Suite 302

Galveston, TX 77550

Defendant Attorneys

Raymond L Gregory, II

Attorney at Eggleston Briscoe LLP

333 Clay St, Ste 4800

Houston, TX 77002

William J Eggleston

Attorney at Eggleston Briscoe LLP

333 Clay Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

John Michael Raborn

Attorney at Eggleston Briscoe LLP

333 Clay St, Ste 4800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit Insurance Dec Page

#19

(#19) MOTION to Remand by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Dec Page)(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Setting as to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#16

(#16) REPLY in Support of #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed by Hitchcock Independent School District. (Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Setting as to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #14 Response. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 02:45 PM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 3) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference , filed on behalf of all Defendants, filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#12

(#12) REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Tom McCartney, Taun Pareek, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#2

(#13) NOTICE of Resetting as to #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit Tab 6 - List of Counsel

1 #5

Exhibit Tab 5 - Index of Matter

1 #4

Exhibit Tab 4 - Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Tab 2 - Pleadings on File

1 #2

Exhibit Tab 1 - Executed Process

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 405th Judicial District Court of Galveston County, case number 19-CV-0928 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22622129) filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover, Tom McCartney, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Taun Pareek, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Tab 1 - Executed Process, #3 Exhibit Tab 2 - Pleadings on File, #4 Exhibit Tab 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Tab 5 - Index of Matter, #6 Exhibit Tab 6 - List of Counsel)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Pre-Motion Conference held on August 15, 2019 as to [Dkt. 12] Request for pre-motion conference. Plaintiff will file the motion to remand by next Wednesday, August 21, 2019. Defendant will file a response by Wednesday, September 11, 2019. Plaintiff may file a reply by September 25, 2019. Defendant is allowed to file a motion to compel arbitration without the need to file a pre-motion letter. Such a motion should be filed by Wednesday, August 21, 2019. Plaintiff's response is due September 11, 2019. Defendant may file a reply by September 25, 2019. The Court would appreciate, if possible, the parties to provide the reply briefs by Wednesday, September 18. Appearances: April Rosenbaum for the plaintiff and Raymond Gregory, II and John Raborn for the defendants. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Remand by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Dec Page)(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Setting as to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Andrew Edison re #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed. (SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre-motion conference scheduled for August 7, 2019 (Dkt #15 ) cancelled, filed. (SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY in Support of #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed by Hitchcock Independent School District. (Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Setting as to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, #14 Response. Parties notified. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 02:45 PM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 3) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE to #12 REQUEST for pre-motion conference , filed on behalf of all Defendants, filed by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Resetting as to #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 9/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison, filed. (dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ***STRICKEN*** MOTION to Remand by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Dec Page)(Hodge, Shaun) Modified on 7/17/2019 (agould, 3). (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hitchcock Independent School District, filed.(Hodge, Shaun) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED ANSWER to by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Tom McCartney, Taun Pareek, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by Taun Pareek, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Tom McCartney, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, International Insurance Company of Hannover, Lexington Insurance Company, Tom McCartney, Taun Pareek, filed.(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 405th Judicial District Court of Galveston County, case number 19-CV-0928 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22622129) filed by International Insurance Company of Hannover, Tom McCartney, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Taun Pareek, Certain Underwriters At Lloyd's London, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Princeton Excess & Surplus Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Tab 1 - Executed Process, #3 Exhibit Tab 2 - Pleadings on File, #4 Exhibit Tab 4 - Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Tab 5 - Index of Matter, #6 Exhibit Tab 6 - List of Counsel)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less