This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 09:14:41 (UTC).

Hiscock v. Argon Medical Devices, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Hiscock filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00952

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chaz Hiscock

Defendants

Argon Medical Devices, Inc.

Rex Medical, Inc. doing business as Rex Medical, LP

Rex Medical, L.P.

Rex Medical, Inc. doing business as Rex Medical, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION and Order to Amend Plaintiff's Complaint by Consent by Argon Medical Devices, Inc.. (Koschineg, Ernest) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer due date updated as to Argon Medical Devices, Inc. answer due 10/15/2021; Rex Medical, Inc. answer due 10/15/2021; Rex Medical, L.P. answer due 10/15/2021 (SG) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: The stipulation to extend the defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint until 10/15/2021, Docket Item #3 , is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/1/2021. (MLA) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Enlarge Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chaz Hiscock. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Argon Medical Devices, Inc., Rex Medical, Inc., Rex Medical, L.P.. (TMK) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Argon Medical Devices, Inc., Rex Medical, Inc., Rex Medical, L.P. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4339636, filed by Chaz Hiscock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARGON MEDICAL DEVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Rex Medical, Inc., d/b/a Rex Medical, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Baughman