This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2020 at 08:40:25 (UTC).

Hirsh v. Midland Credit Management Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Hirsh filed an Other lawsuit against Midland Credit Management Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01104

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Adam Hirsh

Wichita, KS 67217

Defendant

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua C. Dickinson

Attorney at Spencer Fane, LLP - Omaha

13520 California Street, Suite 290

Omaha, NE 68154

Kersten L. Holzhueter

Attorney at Spencer Fane, LLP - KC

1000 Walnut Street, Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Envelope

15 #1

Letter

#15

(#15) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh - trial to be held in Wichita. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(heo) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#14

(#14) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Plaintiff and counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/25/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/25/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/12/20. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh, 410 W. 53rd St. So, Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail on May 13, 2020. (aw) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc.(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

11 #1

***Duplicate Document received by mail 5/4/2020***

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc., filed by James Adam Hirsh.(sz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2020: #1 ***Duplicate Document received by mail 5/4/2020***) (sz). (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#10

(#10) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/11/2020 for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/24/2020. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh at 410 W. 53rd St. S., Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (jk) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Sedgwick County District Court on 4/1/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

8 #1

State Court Records

#8

(#8) STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

6 #1

Ex A - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kersten L. Holzhueter on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc. (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

1 #1

Ex 1 - State Court Action

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 20SC0169, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5120976.), filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh - trial to be held in Wichita. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(heo) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Plaintiff and counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703 as participants. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/25/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/25/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/12/20. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh, 410 W. 53rd St. So, Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail on May 13, 2020. (aw) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc.(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management Inc., filed by James Adam Hirsh.(sz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2020: #1 ***Duplicate Document received by mail 5/4/2020***) (sz). (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/11/2020 for Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 4/24/2020. Mailed to pro se party James Adam Hirsh at 410 W. 53rd St. S., Wichita, KS 67217 by regular mail. (jk) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. served by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Sedgwick County District Court on 4/1/2020.) (mam) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE re Pro Se Mailing: Document 7 Order of Recusal mailed to James Adam Hirsh at 410 W. 53rd St. S. Wichita, KS 67217 on 4/21/2020 by regular mail. (mam) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Midland Credit Management Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kersten L. Holzhueter on behalf of Midland Credit Management Inc. (Holzhueter, Kersten) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff James Adam Hirsh at 410 W. 53rd St. S., Wichita, KS 67217. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Plaintiff of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Encore Capital Group, Inc. as corporate parent . (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 20SC0169, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5120976.), filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Action)(Dickinson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less