This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:26:05 (UTC).

Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc v. Lexington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lexington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01002

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc

2460 Kerper Blvd.

Dubuque, IA 52001

Defendant

Lexington Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brenda K Wallrichs

Attorney at Lederer Weston Craig PLC

118 Third Avenue Se Suite 700, P O Box 1927

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-1927

J Michael Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

118 3Rd Ave Se Ste 700, Po Box 1927

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406-1927

Defendant Attorneys

Jason W Miller

Attorney at Patterson Law Firm

505 5Th Avenue, Suite 729

Des Moines, IA 50309

Howard B Randell

Attorney at Leahy Eisenberg & Fraenkel Ltd

33 West Monroe Street, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60603

Scott Wing

Attorney at Leahy Eisenberg & Fraenkel Ltd

33 West Monroe, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Hirschbach Transportation Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GR Equipment Leadings, Inc. d/b/a Next Level Leasing d/b/a Orange Equipment Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate Grojean Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate All In Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Smooth Air Leasing LLC, Other Affiliate Overdrive Risk Retention Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Hirschbach Bus Lines, LLC for Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (Wallrichs, Brenda) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing IL

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Wing ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3611008) by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing IL) (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing IL

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Howard B. Randell ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3610999) by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing IL) (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

5 #1

Jury Demand

#5

(#5) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please see new removal case packet attached. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 2/18/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#2

(#2) STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Dubuque County, case number LACV112813. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AIANDC-3603450), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 3/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Jason) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (jlh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc identifying Other Affiliate Hirschbach Transportation Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GR Equipment Leadings, Inc. d/b/a Next Level Leasing d/b/a Orange Equipment Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate Grojean Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate All In Properties, LLC, Other Affiliate Smooth Air Leasing LLC, Other Affiliate Overdrive Risk Retention Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Hirschbach Bus Lines, LLC for Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (Wallrichs, Brenda) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company. (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Howard B. Randell and Scott Wing on behalf of Defendant Lexington Insurance Company. Upon review of the motions and certificates of good standing, the court finds the motions should be granted, on the condition attorneys register for NextGen by 2/10/2022. Signed by Clerk on 1/27/2022. (eAtty Randell, eAtty Wing) (jlh) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Wing ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3611008) by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing IL) (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Howard B. Randell ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3610999) by Defendant Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing IL) (Miller, Jason) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER With Jury Demand to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Miller, Jason) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 2/8/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCKET Annotation: Please see new removal case packet attached. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 2/18/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. Conflicts checked, none found. (jlh) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Dubuque County, case number LACV112813. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AIANDC-3603450), filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Scheduling Report due by 3/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Jason) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (jlh) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard B. Randell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Wing