This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:44:19 (UTC).

Hinshaw et al v. Padda et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hinshaw filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Padda. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E Dowdell, Frank H McCarthy and Christine D Little. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00474

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

Referral Judges

Frank H McCarthy

Christine D Little

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Amanda Hinshaw

Dustin Hinshaw

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Delta Logistics Inc.

Bhupinder Padda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Gregory James Denney

Attorney at Denney & Stinnett (Sapulpa)

301 E Dewey

Sapulpa, OK 74066

Brad Roberson

Attorney at Roberson, Kolker, Cooper & Goeres, P.C.

16408 Muirfield Place

Edmond, OK 73013

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Mehry Taremi

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr Ste 100

Norman, OK 73069

Christopher Blake Moore

Attorney at Mills & Jones, PLLC

2760 Washington Dr., Ste #100

Norman, OK 73069

Daniel Khristian Jones

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr Ste 100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#20

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#9

#5

#4

#3

2 #5

Exhibit Ex 5_Proof of Service Def Padda

2 #4

Exhibit Ex 4_EOA Denney

2 #3

Exhibit Ex 3_Summons issued to Def Delta

2 #2

Exhibit Ex 2_Pet

2 #1

Exhibit Ex 1_OSCN Dkt Summary

#2

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Delta Logistics Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a Scheduling Order in this case. The pending dismissal motion (Doc. 12) should first be resolved. (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2020
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-474-JED-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brad Roberson on behalf of Amanda Hinshaw [Note: Attorney Brad Roberson added to party Amanda Hinshaw(pty:cd).] (Roberson, Brad) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Delta Logistics Inc., Bhupinder Padda ; (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Amanda Hinshaw, Dustin Hinshaw ; (Denney, Gregory) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #9 Counterclaim ) by Amanda Hinshaw, Dustin Hinshaw (Denney, Gregory) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gregory James Denney on behalf of Amanda Hinshaw, Dustin Hinshaw (Denney, Gregory) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong "against" party selected; Correction: changed text to reflect correct "against" party (Re: #9 Counterclaim ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (filed as Errata/Correction) ( ) by Delta Logistics Inc., Bhupinder Padda (Taremi, Mehry) Modified on 10/1/2020 to change event (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Amanda Hinshaw by Delta Logistics Inc. (Taremi, Mehry) Modified on 10/1/2020 to change "against" party (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Delta Logistics Inc., Bhupinder Padda (With attachments) (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Delta Logistics Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher Blake Moore on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Christopher Blake Moore added to party Delta Logistics Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Blake Moore added to party Bhupinder Padda(pty:dft).] (Moore, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mehry Taremi on behalf of All Defendants (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel Khristian Jones on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Daniel Khristian Jones added to party Delta Logistics Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Khristian Jones added to party Bhupinder Padda(pty:dft).] (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Delta Logistics Inc., Bhupinder Padda (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Creek County District Court, case number CJ-2020-212 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2272865) by Delta Logistics Inc., Bhupinder Padda (With attachments) (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Delta Logistics Inc., Bhupinder Padda (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Amanda Hinshaw, Dustin Hinshaw (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad Roberson