This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/10/2021 at 08:27:05 (UTC).

HINSCH v. EQT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/11/2020 HINSCH filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against EQT CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David S. Cercone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01716

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S. Cercone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER HINSCH

Defendant

EQT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael E. Megrey

Attorney at Woomer & Talarico, LLC

2945 Banksville Road, Suite 200

Pittsburgh, PA 15216-2749

Defendant Attorneys

Mary-Jo Rebelo

Attorney at Burns White LLC

48 26Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Courtney C Brennan

Attorney at Burns White LLC

48 26Th Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Emilie R. Hammerstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Taylor N. Brailey

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 2/3/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/10/2021. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 2/10/2021. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 1/7/2021. (kly) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketUpdate Answer Deadline: Answer due from EQT CORPORATION on 1/29/2021 (ept) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Courtney C Brennan and Mary-Jo Rebelo terminated. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 12/4/2020. (kly) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by EQT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rebelo, Mary-Jo) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER HINSCH. Waivewr sent on 11/30/2020, answer due from EQT CORPORATION on 1/29/2021. (Megrey, Michael) Modified on 12/4/2020 to indicate waiver sent and anser due dates (ept). (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EQT CORPORATION. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor N. Brailey on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Brailey, Taylor) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney C Brennan on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Brennan, Courtney) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary-Jo Rebelo on behalf of EQT CORPORATION. (Rebelo, Mary-Jo) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to EQT CORPORATION (bgs) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBITS in Support of #1 Complaint (Verification) by WALTER HINSCH. (bgs) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EQT CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6075726), filed by WALTER HINSCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bgs) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQT Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Taylor N. Brailey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emilie R. Hammerstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtney C. Brennan Esq.