This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 10:00:49 (UTC).

Hinojosa v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Hinojosa filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00772

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Hinojosa

Defendants

Pioneer Credit

Trans Union, LLC

American Honda Finance Corp.

American Honda Finance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peyton Lynette Stein

Attorney at McCarty & Raburn, A Consumer Law Firm PLLC - Rockwall

2931 Ridge Rd, Suite 101 #504

Rockwall, TX 75032

Dennis Dean McCarty

Attorney at McCarty & Raburn, A Consumer Law Firm PLLC - Rockwall

2931 Ridge Rd, Suite 101 #504

Rockwall, TX 75032

Jonathan Forrest Raburn

Attorney at McCarty & Raburn, A Consumer Law Firm PLLC - Rockwall

2931 Ridge Rd, Suite 101 #504

Rockwall, TX 75032

Defendant Attorneys

Reid Stephens Manley

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Paul W Sheldon

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC - Plano

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Amy M Stewart

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pioneer Credit.( Manley, Reid) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Sheldon, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#6

(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Trans Union, LLC.( Sheldon, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Honda Finance Corporation.(Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Pioneer Credit. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Finance Corporation. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Trans Union Report Dated 10/08/2018

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8045436.), filed by Danielle Hinojosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Trans Union Report Dated 10/08/2018)(Stein, Peyton) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pioneer Credit to 12/21/2020. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pioneer Credit.( Manley, Reid) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Trans Union, LLC to 12/14/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( rpc, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. (Sheldon, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Trans Union, LLC.( Sheldon, Paul) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Honda Finance Corporation.(Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Pioneer Credit. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to American Honda Finance Corporation. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8045436.), filed by Danielle Hinojosa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Trans Union Report Dated 10/08/2018)(Stein, Peyton) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA FINANCE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peyton Lynette Stein