This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/10/2023 at 13:12:44 (UTC).

Hinnewinkel v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Hinnewinkel filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark D. Clarke. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01415

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark D. Clarke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katrina Hinnewinkel

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheila M. Bossier

Defendant Attorneys

Kate Middleton

Mark Joseph Winebrenner

32 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#186

(#186) JUDGMENT: Ordered that this action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed on 10/15/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#185

(#185) Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party filed as Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Erfle, Nancy) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#183

(#183) ORDER: Granting Amended Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal of CR Bard., Inc., with Prejudice #182 . Signed on 09/28/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#182

(#182) Stipulated Motion to Dismiss filed as "Amended Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal of C.R. Bard, Inc., With Prejudice". Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#179

(#179) Notice of Settlement with Boston Scientific Corp. Filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#178

(#178) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Thomas J. Joensen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8062090. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Joensen, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#176

(#181) Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement #179 , all deadlines in this case, including the trial date, are vacated. Boston Scientific Corporations Motion for Leave to Take Supplemental Deposition of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. #176 is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#9

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #1

Amended Complaint

#7

#6

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

481 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#186) JUDGMENT: Ordered that this action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and with each party bearing its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed on 10/15/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#185) Stipulated Notice of Dismissal of Party filed as Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Erfle, Nancy) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#184) SCHEUDLING ORDER: It has been more than 120 days since Plaintiff filed the Notice of Settlement with Boston Scientific Corp #179 . The Court finds no reason why judgment should be delayed. The parties are ordered to file with the Court a stipulated judgment of dismissal for Boston Scientific Corp., or a joint status report explaining why judgment should not be entered by 10/15/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#183) ORDER: Granting Amended Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal of CR Bard., Inc., with Prejudice #182 . Signed on 09/28/2021 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#182) Stipulated Motion to Dismiss filed as "Amended Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal of C.R. Bard, Inc., With Prejudice". Filed by C. R. Bard, Inc.. (French, Pilar) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#181) Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement #179 , all deadlines in this case, including the trial date, are vacated. Boston Scientific Corporations Motion for Leave to Take Supplemental Deposition of Michael Thomas Margolis, M.D. #176 is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#180) ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #178 . Tom Joensen on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021
View Court Documents

DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Thomas J. Joensen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8062090 #178 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#179) Notice of Settlement with Boston Scientific Corp. Filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#178) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Thomas J. Joensen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8062090. Filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Joensen, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
178 More Docket Entries
04/10/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #12 ORDER ENTERED ON 4/17/2018: INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement with regard to BSC. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and BSC may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5419 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (Modified on 4/17/2018 to note order has been vacated) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MOTION by Katrina Hinnewinkel to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Attachment: #1 Amended Complaint)(Bossier, Sheila) (Modified on 3/7/2018 to remove link to #1 short form complaint) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 03/07/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Katrina Hinnewinkel. (Bossier, Sheila) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon Strongman on 10/11/17. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 10/6/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/12/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/12/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 171 (First Amended Docket Control Order Wave 3 Cases) entered on 09/07/2017 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (crg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2017
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6014067. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less