This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2021 at 07:52:52 (UTC).

Hinge Health, Inc. v. Younger

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Hinge Health, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Younger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04024

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hinge Health, Inc.

Defendant

Terry I. Younger

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Antonio Perez

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1201 Third Avenue

Suite 4900, WA 98101

John D. Esterhay

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

11452 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130-2080

Tara Lauren Kurtis

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

Suite 1700, 131 S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hinge Health, Inc. by John D. Esterhay (Esterhay, John) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hinge Health, Inc. by David Antonio Perez (Perez, David) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Attorney David A. Perez's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 on behalf of plaintiff, Hinge Health is granted. Attorney John D. Estherhay's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 on behalf of plaintiff, Hinge Health is granted. Attorney David A. Perez and John D. Estherhay are directed to file their respective appearances forthwith. Mailed notice. (rbf, ) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: This case has been assigned to Judge Pallmeyer. Parties are directed to submit a Report of Planning Meeting by October 4, 2021. Mailed notice. (rbf, ) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18509450. Motion For Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice for John D. Esterhay (Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-18509443. Motion For Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David A. Perez (Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Hinge Health, Inc. re complaint #1 Plaintiff's Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents (Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hinge Health, Inc. re complaint #1 (Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hinge Health, Inc. by Tara Lauren Kurtis (Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,418,571 filed by Hinge Health, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18509390. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kurtis, Tara) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Esterhay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara L. Kurtis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Perez