This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:41:56 (UTC).

Hines v. Neuse Charter School of Johnston County

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Hines filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caroline Hines

Defendant

Neuse Charter School of Johnston County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Walker

Attorney at Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law PLLC

Po Box 1473

Knightdale, NC 27545

Defendant Attorney

Richard Leonard Pinto

Attorney at Pinto Coates Kyre & Bowers, PLLC

3203 Brassfield Rd.

Greensboro, NC 27410

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Selection of Ann Anderson as mediator filed by Caroline Hines. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Motions due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/8/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#15

(#15) Certificate of Service filed by Caroline Hines regarding #14 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) . (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#14

(#14) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Caroline Hines. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#13

(#13) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/1/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Articles of Incorporation

#6

Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Leonard Pinto on behalf of All Defendants. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law at P. O. Box 1473, Knightdale, NC 27545 mailed via US Mail on March 22, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County Federal Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County Federal Civil Cover Sheet. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit State Court Civil Summons

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law at P. O. Box 1473, Knightdale, NC 27545 mailed via US Mail on March 22, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Selection of Ann Anderson as mediator filed by Caroline Hines. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #17 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendant shall have up to and including July 11, 2019, within which to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. Counsel are reminded that pursuant to Rule 29 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, stipulations of extension of time for responses to discovery under Rules 33, 34, and 36 do not need approval from the court provided the extension does not interfere with any time set for completion of discovery, for a hearing of a motion, or for trial. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/23/2019. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Motions due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/8/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Remark - #14 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) referred to Magistrate Judge James E. Gates for the entry of a scheduling order. (Love, L.) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Certificate of Service filed by Caroline Hines regarding #14 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) . (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Caroline Hines. (Walker, Lisa) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/1/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. Pursuant to Section VI.C.2 of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual, each attorney making an appearance in the case must be a registered CM/ECF filer with this court and must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Financial Disclosure Statement by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Articles of Incorporation) (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Leonard Pinto on behalf of All Defendants. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Leonard Pinto on behalf of All Defendants. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Lisa Walker, Attorney at Law at P. O. Box 1473, Knightdale, NC 27545 mailed via US Mail on March 22, 2019. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County Federal Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County Federal Civil Cover Sheet. (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County from GENERAL COURT OF JUSTICE, SUPERIOR COURT DIVISION, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COUNTY OF JOHNSTON, case number 19-CVS-564. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4877902), filed by Neuse Charter School of Johnston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Civil Summons) (Pinto, Richard) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less