This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2019 at 07:50:25 (UTC).

Hinds v. McKowen Family Dental

Case Summary

On 01/08/2019 Hinds filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against McKowen Family Dental. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lajuana M. Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03008

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lajuana M. Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathy L Hinds

Defendant

McKowen Family Dental

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerry M. Kirksey

Attorney at Kirksey Law Firm, LLC

711 S. Albany Ave.

Bolivar, MO 65613

Defendant Attorney

Paul W. King

Attorney at Paul W. King, LLC

901 St. Louis Street, Suite 1501

Springfield, MO 65806-2563

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MOTION for extension of time of due date for rule 26(f) conference filed by Paul W. King on behalf of McKowen Family Dental. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (King, Paul) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against McKowen Family Dental filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Kathy L Hinds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is given five days from the date of this Order to electronically file the Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #10) is deemed properly filed on the date the Amended Complaint is filed. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff is given fourteen days from the date on which the Amended Complaint is filed within which to respond to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's motion to Dismiss is deemed moot. Signed on March 1, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to dismiss case MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Kathy L Hinds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#11

(#11) SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to dismiss case MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant McKowen Family Dental. (Related document(s) #10 ) (King, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

10 #3

Affidavit of Brian Weimer

10 #2

Affidavit of Ray F. McKowen, D.D.S.

10 #1

Affidavit of Ray Christopher McKowen, D.D.S.

#10

(#10) MOTION to dismiss case , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Paul W. King on behalf of McKowen Family Dental. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ray Christopher McKowen, D.D.S., #2 Affidavit of Ray F. McKowen, D.D.S., #3 Affidavit of Brian Weimer)(King, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

9 #1

Amended Complaint

#9

(#9) MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Kathy L Hinds. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#8

(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE & NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/25/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/11/2019. Signed on Febraury 4, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#7

(#7) SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant McKowen Family Dental. (Related document(s) #6 ) (King, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

6 #3

Affidavit of Brian Weimer

6 #2

Affidavit of Ray F. McKowen, D.D.S.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for extension of time of due date for rule 26(f) conference filed by Paul W. King on behalf of McKowen Family Dental. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (King, Paul) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against McKowen Family Dental filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Kathy L Hinds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiff is given five days from the date of this Order to electronically file the Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #10) is deemed properly filed on the date the Amended Complaint is filed. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff is given fourteen days from the date on which the Amended Complaint is filed within which to respond to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's motion to Dismiss is deemed moot. Signed on March 1, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #10 MOTION to dismiss case MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Plaintiff Kathy L Hinds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to dismiss case MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant McKowen Family Dental. (Related document(s) #10 ) (King, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to dismiss case , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Paul W. King on behalf of McKowen Family Dental. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ray Christopher McKowen, D.D.S., #2 Affidavit of Ray F. McKowen, D.D.S., #3 Affidavit of Brian Weimer)(King, Paul) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Kathy L Hinds. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 16 NOTICE & NOTICE OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Proposed scheduling order due by 3/25/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 3/11/2019. Signed on Febraury 4, 2019 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant McKowen Family Dental. (Related document(s) #6 ) (King, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to dismiss case filed by Paul W. King on behalf of McKowen Family Dental. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ray Christopher McKowen, D.D.S., #2 Affidavit of Ray F. McKowen, D.D.S., #3 Affidavit of Brian Weimer)(King, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Paul W. King on behalf of Defendant McKowen Family Dental.(King, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of appearance by Paul W. King on behalf of McKowen Family Dental (Attorney Paul W. King added to party McKowen Family Dental(pty:dft))(King, Paul) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Kathy L Hinds. McKowen Family Dental served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019. (Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to McKowen Family Dental, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against McKowen Family Dental filed by Jerry M. Kirksey on behalf of Kathy L Hinds. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6110108. Service due by 4/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirksey, Jerry) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.