This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 08:31:27 (UTC).

Hindi v. Citibank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Hindi filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Citibank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and Steven C. Yarbrough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Fashing

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Badria Hindi

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Citibank, N.A.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

TransUnion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas H. Mattison

Kevin P Holmes

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Bryan Brown

Michael McKleroy

Patricia Williams

Charles J. Vigil

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Angela M. Taylor on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Taylor, Angela) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by Badria Hindi SECOND NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

#17

(#17) CitiBank N.A.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against Badria Hindi by Citibank, N.A.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Badria Hindi.(McKleroy, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed by Citibank, N.A.. (McKleroy, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2023 (jg). (Entered: 04/06/2023)

#15

(#15) NOTICE by Badria Hindi EXTENSION OF TIME (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

#14

(#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (kfo) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, Patricia) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, Patricia) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Williams on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Williams, Patricia) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

1 #12

Exhibit EXHIBIT 6

1 #10

Exhibit EXHIBIT 5B

1 #7

Exhibit EXHIBIT 4B

1 #6

Exhibit EXHIBIT 4A

1 #5

Exhibit EXHIBIT 3

1 #4

Exhibit EXHIBIT 2

1 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT 1B

1 #2

Exhibit EXHIBT 1A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Angela M. Taylor on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Taylor, Angela) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE by Badria Hindi SECOND NOTICE OF EXTENSION OF TIME (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CitiBank N.A.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , First COUNTERCLAIM against Badria Hindi by Citibank, N.A.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Badria Hindi.(McKleroy, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Returned Executed by Citibank, N.A.. (McKleroy, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2023 (jg). (Entered: 04/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE by Badria Hindi EXTENSION OF TIME (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (kfo) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, Patricia) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, Patricia) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Williams on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Williams, Patricia) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Vigil, Charles) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Badria Hindi. TransUnion, LLC served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Badria Hindi. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Badria Hindi. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Badria Hindi. Citibank, N.A. served on 3/2/2023, answer due 3/23/2023. (Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Badria Hindi voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Mattison, Nicholas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8700672 re #1 Complaint, filed by Badria Hindi (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Badria Hindi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EXHIBT 1A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4A, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4B, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4C, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5A, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5B, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5C, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7)(Mattison, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less