This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/25/2019 at 08:04:28 (UTC).

Hilton v. Prause et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2019 Hilton filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Prause. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jason K. Pulliam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00755

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jason K. Pulliam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald L. Hilton, Jr

Defendants

Liberos, LLC

Nicole Prause

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel W. Packard

Attorney at Packard Law Firm

1100 N.W. Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant Attorney

Claire Winniford Parsons

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

909 Fannin Street, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #17 MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#18

(#18) DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** re #17 MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute (aej) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

17 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

17 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#17

(#17) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Parsons, Claire) Modified on 8/23/2019 (aej). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#16

(#16) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#15

(#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letters. (aej) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #4

Personal Data Sheet Parties of the Case

1 #3

Supplement Supplement to JS 44

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicole Prause (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12282212), filed by Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplement to JS 44, #4 Personal Data Sheet Parties of the Case)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #17 MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) DEFICIENCY NOTICE:***NOTIFIED COUNSEL THAT DOCUMENT IS DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** re #17 MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute (aej) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ***DOCUMENT DEFICIENT - MISSING PROPOSED ORDER*** MOTION to Stay Ruling Pending Supplemental Briefing and Decision by Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Objections and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to the Texas Anti-Slapp Statute by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Parsons, Claire) Modified on 8/23/2019 (aej). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Proposed Scheduling Order by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause, re #11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Defendant Liberos, LLC, Defendant Nicole Prause (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. Signed by Jason K. Pulliam. Referral Magistrate Judge: Henry J. Bemporad. (aej) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Donald L. Hilton, Jr, re #11 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Defendant Liberos, LLC, Defendant Nicole Prause (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Jason K. Pulliam for all proceedings. Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (jkda) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause filed by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(aej) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Defamation Per Se by Liberos, LLC, Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Donald L. Hilton, Jr. (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order and Advisory. Proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (aej) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Pro Hac Vice Letters. (aej) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (aej) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (aej) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicole Prause (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12282212), filed by Nicole Prause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplement to JS 44, #4 Personal Data Sheet Parties of the Case)(Parsons, Claire) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBEROS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Packard