This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2022 at 09:08:16 (UTC).

Hill v. State Farm et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Hill filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State Farm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Eli J. Richardson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony B. Hill

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendants

State Farm

TDCI

AT&T

State Secretary of Tennessee

Coca Cola

Keiven J. Smith

Amazon

State of Tennessee

EPA

IRS

Hickman County Register of Deeds

Davidson County Courthouse

FedEx

UPS

USPost Office

MNPD

Alteck

Pepsi

Federal Government

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Charles S. J. Sharrett

Attorney at London & Amburn, PC (Knoxville Office)

607 Market Street, Suite 900

Knoxville, TN 37902

Matthew J. Evans

Attorney at Kay Griffin, PLLC

900 S. Gay Street, Suite 1810

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 121 Hotel, The, AT&T, Alexis Inn, Aloft, Alteck, Amazon, Auto Zone, Burger King, Cambria Hotel, Carvana, Coca Cola, Comfort Inns, Country Inn Suites, DHS, Davidson County Courthouse, EPA, FedEx, Federal Government, Federal Reserve, Hickman County Register of Deeds, Hilton Hotel, Holiday Inn, Home Depot, Homewood Suites, IRS, Lowes, MNPD, Mental Health Coop, Metro Parks, Metro Water, Millennium Maxwell Hotel, NCAA, NES Nashville Tennessee, Nascar, News 2 Nashville Tennessee, News 5 Sky 5, Pepsi, Ryder, Keiven J. Smith, State Farm, State Secretary of Tennessee, State of Tennessee, TDCI, TMHI, UBS, UPS, USPost Office, and Wallstreet Dow n Jones NY, filed by Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Injunction by Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The application to proceed as pauper #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of an amended application. The "Motion for Injunction" #3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling supported by good cause. The Clerk SHALL mail Plaintiff a blank Complaint for a Civil Case (Pro Se 1) and Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs for Non-Prisoners (AO 239). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/9/2022. (xc: Order, Pro Se Form 1 and AO 239 forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Evans on behalf of State Farm (Evans, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. J. Sharrett on behalf of State Farm (Sharrett, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service filed by State Farm re #7 Notice of Appearance filed by State Farm. (Evans, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service filed by State Farm re #8 Notice of Appearance filed by State Farm. (Sharrett, Charles) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/24/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#12

(#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. In Dispute. Unable to Forward. #6 Order, Terminate Motions. Mail sent to Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. In Dispute. Unable to Forward. #6 Order, Terminate Motions. Mail sent to Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 10/24/2022. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service filed by State Farm re #8 Notice of Appearance filed by State Farm. (Sharrett, Charles) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service filed by State Farm re #7 Notice of Appearance filed by State Farm. (Evans, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Matthew J. Evans, Charles S. J. Sharrett admitted to this court. (kc) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 and #8 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (kc) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. J. Sharrett on behalf of State Farm (Sharrett, Charles) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Evans on behalf of State Farm (Evans, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The application to proceed as pauper #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of an amended application. The "Motion for Injunction" #3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling supported by good cause. The Clerk SHALL mail Plaintiff a blank Complaint for a Civil Case (Pro Se 1) and Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs for Non-Prisoners (AO 239). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/9/2022. (xc: Order, Pro Se Form 1 and AO 239 forwarded to Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDue to clerical error, and Standing Order of conflict/recusal list, (party "Home Depot") District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr no longer assigned to case. District Judge Eli J. Richardson randomly reassigned and added. (bs) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Injunction by Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 121 Hotel, The, AT&T, Alexis Inn, Aloft, Alteck, Amazon, Auto Zone, Burger King, Cambria Hotel, Carvana, Coca Cola, Comfort Inns, Country Inn Suites, DHS, Davidson County Courthouse, EPA, FedEx, Federal Government, Federal Reserve, Hickman County Register of Deeds, Hilton Hotel, Holiday Inn, Home Depot, Homewood Suites, IRS, Lowes, MNPD, Mental Health Coop, Metro Parks, Metro Water, Millennium Maxwell Hotel, NCAA, NES Nashville Tennessee, Nascar, News 2 Nashville Tennessee, News 5 Sky 5, Pepsi, Ryder, Keiven J. Smith, State Farm, State Secretary of Tennessee, State of Tennessee, TDCI, TMHI, UBS, UPS, USPost Office, and Wallstreet Dow n Jones NY, filed by Anthony B. Hill. (kc) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPA is a litigant

Latest cases where Pepsi Co Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Government of the United States is a litigant

Latest cases where IRS is a litigant