This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2021 at 12:41:27 (UTC).

Hall v. Smoak et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Hall filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Smoak INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen Michael Doyle and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01052

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jonathan Hill

Dothan, AL 36301

Jonathan Hall

Dothan, AL 36301

Defendants

Lt. Down

Jason Smoak

James Brazier

William Moore

Mark Trawick

Mr. Murphy

Sgt. Fears

Carla Snell

Sharon King

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Supporting Document

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the undersigned Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice; Objections to R&R due by 3/4/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 2/18/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #6 Order sent to William Moore returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender; No Mail Receptacle; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #6 Order sent to Jonathan Hall returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender; No Mail Receptacle; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #1 Complaint & #4 Order sent to William Moore returned with the following USPS notation, "Not at This Address; Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #4 Order sent to Jonathan Hall returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: DIRECTING that on or before 1/25/2021, Plaintiff shall file with the court a current address or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to adequately prosecute this action; further DIRECTING that the directive requiring Defendants to file an answer and special report to the complaint be held in ABEYANCE pending Plaintiff's compliance with this order; DIRECTING the Clerk to furnish a copy of this order to Plaintiff at his last known mailing address and to Defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/13/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #3 Order sent to Jonathan Hall returned with the following USPS notation, " Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return Receipt Card showing service of Complaint & #4 Order not signed for Carla Snell served on 1/4/2021, answer due 2/8/2021. (am, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 2/8/2021, as further set out in Order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/28/2020. (am, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON MOTION: GRANTING the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 12/28/2020.(Furnished: Cashier & Account Clerk @ HCJ) (am, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jonathan Hall. (es, ) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against James Brazier, Lt. Down, Sgt. Fears, Sharon King, William Moore, Mr. Murphy, Jason Smoak, Carla Snell, Mark Trawick, filed by Jonathan Hall. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(es, ) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mr. Murphy is a litigant