This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2022 at 08:52:15 (UTC).

Hill v. Payne et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2021 Hill filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Payne. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and J. Thomas Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01206

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

J. Thomas Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Adam Hill

Tucker, AR 72168-8713

Defendants

Dexter Payne

Rory Griffin

Dale Reed

Joe Page, III

Collins

Martin

Knight

R Straughn

Bolden

Ireland

William Straughn

Ramsey

Dodds

Deborah Williams

White

Yelland

Seamster

WellPath Medical Corporation

Parsins

3 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Adam Hill. (llg) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Assistance by Adam Hill. (llg) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #2 Motion for Assistance; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit; and directing authorized prison officials to assist Hill in completing the necessary forms. Specifically, prison officials are to complete and sign a trust fund account statement and certificate for Hill and provide it to him no later than 1/5/2022, so that he can submit the completed IFP application to the Clerk prior to the 1/15/2022 deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/16/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

4 #4

Main Document - Incorrect (see below)

4 #1

Main Document - Correct

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Docket entry modified on 12/20/2021 to correct the file date) (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Letter. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #4 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#7

(#7) EVIDENCE by Adam Hill. (kdr) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#10

(#10) ADDENDUM to #9 Motion for TRO filed by Adam Hill. (llg) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ADDENDUM to #9 Motion for TRO filed by Adam Hill. (llg) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EVIDENCE by Adam Hill. (kdr) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 12/17/2021 as marked on the document. (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Letter. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #4 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Docket entry modified on 12/20/2021 to correct the file date) (jak) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER to the Court by Adam Hill. (ldb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak). (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #2 Motion for Assistance; directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit; and directing authorized prison officials to assist Hill in completing the necessary forms. Specifically, prison officials are to complete and sign a trust fund account statement and certificate for Hill and provide it to him no later than 1/5/2022, so that he can submit the completed IFP application to the Clerk prior to the 1/15/2022 deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/16/2021. (kdr) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Assistance by Adam Hill. (llg) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Adam Hill. (llg) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bolden is a litigant

Latest cases where Dodds is a litigant

Latest cases where Knight is a litigant

Latest cases where RAMSEY is a litigant