This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2022 at 08:00:41 (UTC).

Hill v. PAE Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Hill filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against PAE Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-10630

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramon Hill

Defendants

PAE Incorporated

Charles D. Peiffer

Marshall A. Heinberg

Paul T. Bader

John P. Hendrickson

Mary M. Jackson

Louis Samson

Delara Zarrabi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan J. Smith

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith, L.L.C.

240 Mineola Blvd.

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Paul T. Bader, Marshall A. Heinberg, John P. Hendrickson, Mary M. Jackson, PAE Incorporated, Charles D. Peiffer, Louis Samson, Delara Zarrabi. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25459201)Document filed by Ramon Hill..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ramon Hill..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAE INCORPORATED, CHARLES D. PEIFFER, MARSHALL A. HEINBERG, PAUL T. BADER, JOHN P. HENDRICKSON, MARY M. JACKSON, LOUIS SAMSON, and DELARA ZARRABI, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramon Hill..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul T. Bader, Marshall A. Heinberg, John P. Hendrickson, Mary M. Jackson, PAE Incorporated, Charles D. Peiffer, Louis Samson, Delara Zarrabi. (sj) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/29/2021) (ks) Modified on 1/6/2022 (ks). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/16/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/29/2021) (ks) Modified on 1/6/2022 (ks). (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul T. Bader, Marshall A. Heinberg, John P. Hendrickson, Mary M. Jackson, PAE Incorporated, Charles D. Peiffer, Louis Samson, Delara Zarrabi. (sj) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAE INCORPORATED, CHARLES D. PEIFFER, MARSHALL A. HEINBERG, PAUL T. BADER, JOHN P. HENDRICKSON, MARY M. JACKSON, LOUIS SAMSON, and DELARA ZARRABI, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ramon Hill..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ramon Hill..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Paul T. Bader, Marshall A. Heinberg, John P. Hendrickson, Mary M. Jackson, PAE Incorporated, Charles D. Peiffer, Louis Samson, Delara Zarrabi. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25459201)Document filed by Ramon Hill..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Jason Smith