This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2021 at 09:00:22 (UTC).

HILL v. COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 HILL filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00110

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMETRIUS HILL

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendants

COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT

BRADLEY

BOP DIRECTOR

PROG. DIV. ASST. DIRECTOR

KRUGER

IAN CONNERS

ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN BOP STAFF

 

Court Documents

22 #3

Envelope

22 #2

Cover Letter

22 #1

Exhibit

#22

(#22) MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiff DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

21 #3

Envelope

21 #2

Exhibit

21 #1

Cover Letter

#21

(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN BOP STAFF, BOP DIRECTOR, BRADLEY, IAN CONNERS, COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT, KRUGER, PROG. DIV. ASST. DIRECTOR, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit A through K

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff's #7 Response to the Court's March 9, 2020 Order #5 , the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff a second 30-day extension of time to submit a six-month trust account statement. All other provisions of the March 9, 2020 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/27/20. (ms) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to DEMETRIUS HILL; Type of Document Returned: ORDER. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#5

MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff's #7 Response to the Court's March 9, 2020 Order #5 , the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff a second 30-day extension of time to submit a six-month trust account statement. All other provisions of the March 9, 2020 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/27/20. (ms) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#4

(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #3 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#3

(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #3 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#19) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, filed on November 5, 2019, dkt. #2 , is granted. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Twenty Dollars and Eight Cents ($20.08).He shall have through April 24, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #9 , is denied without prejudice. The motion for equitable relief, dkt. #13 , is denied as premature as to the requests for a conference and defendants' responses. The motion, dkt. #13 , is granted to the extent that the clerk is directed to include a copy of the complaint, dkt. #1 , with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 1)(KAA) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#14) ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Terre Haute Division, for consideration of Plaintiff's complaint #1 , application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ 2, 8], motion for preliminary relief #9 , motion for equitable relief #13 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/22/2021. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiff DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#20) RECEIPT #NA004400 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $20.08, paid by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (TMC) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN BOP STAFF, BOP DIRECTOR, BRADLEY, IAN CONNERS, COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT, KRUGER, PROG. DIV. ASST. DIRECTOR, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(JRB) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR EQUITABLE RELIEF - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, filed on November 5, 2019, dkt. #2 , is granted. The plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Twenty Dollars and Eight Cents ($20.08).He shall have through April 24, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, dkt. #9 , is denied without prejudice. The motion for equitable relief, dkt. #13 , is denied as premature as to the requests for a conference and defendants' responses. The motion, dkt. #13 , is granted to the extent that the clerk is directed to include a copy of the complaint, dkt. #1 , with the plaintiff's copy of this Order. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Dkt 1)(KAA) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DWH) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-04920. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of Indiana (Terra Haute Division) the electronic record. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: The Court transfers this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, Terre Haute Division, for consideration of Plaintiff's complaint #1 , application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ 2, 8], motion for preliminary relief #9 , motion for equitable relief #13 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 2/22/2021. Mailed notice(gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Demetrius Hill for equitable relief. (Envelope postmarked 1/21/21; institution mail room 1/20/21) (aee, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DEMETRIUS HILL (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon review of Plaintiff's #7 Response to the Court's March 9, 2020 Order #5 , the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff a second 30-day extension of time to submit a six-month trust account statement. All other provisions of the March 9, 2020 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/27/20. (ms) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #5 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement,, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (adh, ) "LEAVE TO FILE GRANTED" Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/15/2020. [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to DEMETRIUS HILL; Type of Document Returned: ORDER. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement (or institutional equivalent) or state in writing why he cannot do so and the length of time he expects to be unable to do so. Failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 03/06/2020. (zmc) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #3 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner Statement, filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2019. (zmd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEMETRIUS HILL (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(adh, ) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct docket entry text (zsb). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 8/21/2020.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTER TERRORISM UNIT is a litigant

Latest cases where KRUGER is a litigant

Latest cases where BRADLEY is a litigant