This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 07:48:22 (UTC).

HILL v. COUNTER TERROISM UNIT

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 HILL filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against COUNTER TERROISM UNIT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03364

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMETRIUS HILL

Terre Haute, IN 47808

Defendant

COUNTER TERROISM UNIT

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEMETRIUS HILL (adh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/20/2019. (zmd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEMETRIUS HILL (adh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DEMETRIUS HILL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less