This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 09:13:21 (UTC).

Hill v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Hill filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00362

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cheryl Hill

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ian A Taylor

Attorney at Morris Law LLC

12019 Ocean Highway, Po Box 1885

Pawleys Island, SC 29585

Jeffrey D Morris

Attorney at Morris Law LLC

811 6Th Avenue South

Surfside Beach, SC 29575

Defendant Attorney

Alfred Johnston Cox

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 7368, 1201 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Cheryl Hill(Taylor, Ian) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#18

(#18) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's ADR Statement/Certification due by 3/26/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/2/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/1/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/1/2021, Discovery due by 11/1/2021, Mediation Due by 11/8/2021, Motions due by 11/15/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2022 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/24/21. (kmca) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#17

(#17) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Cheryl Hill.(Taylor, Ian) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#16

(#16) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#15

(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order

#14

(#14) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Cheryl Hill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Cox, Alfred) Modified on 3/23/2021: to add joint filer as listed (kmca). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#13

(#13) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 8/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/17/21. (kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/9/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/23/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 3/23/2021, ADR Statement/Certification due by 3/23/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/2/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/2/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2021, Discovery due by 8/2/2021, Motions due by 8/16/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 12/6/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/17/21. (kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#11

(#11) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cheryl Hill.(Morris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #5 Answer to Complaint. (kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(kmca) Modified on 2/5/2021: to correct file date (kmca). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-42-04497. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9631922), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/5/2021: to correct typo as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Cheryl Hill(Taylor, Ian) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's ADR Statement/Certification due by 3/26/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/2/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/1/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/1/2021, Discovery due by 11/1/2021, Mediation Due by 11/8/2021, Motions due by 11/15/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 3/1/2022 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/24/21. (kmca) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Cheryl Hill.(Taylor, Ian) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Cheryl Hill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order)(Cox, Alfred) Modified on 3/23/2021: to add joint filer as listed (kmca). (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 8/9/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/17/21. (kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/9/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/23/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 3/23/2021, ADR Statement/Certification due by 3/23/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/2/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/2/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2021, Discovery due by 8/2/2021, Motions due by 8/16/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 12/6/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 2/17/21. (kmca) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cheryl Hill.(Morris, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (2/19/21). (kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #5 Answer to Complaint. (kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(kmca) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(kmca) Modified on 2/5/2021: to correct file date (kmca). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-42-04497. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9631922), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/5/2021: to correct typo as provided by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Johnston Cox