This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/15/2021 at 17:32:44 (UTC).

Hill v. Accordia Life and Annuity Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Hill filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Accordia Life and Annuity Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Samuel H. Mays, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02241

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gennie Hill

Defendants

Accordia Life and Annuity Company

Mose Guy

Mose Guy Financial Services

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jocelyn V. Henderson

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOCELYN V. HENDERSON

200 Jefferson, Ste 1500

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

William B. Wahlheim, Jr.

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 Sixth Avenue, North, Suite 2400 Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joshua Robert Hess

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE, PC

1901 Sixth Ave N, Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

James Ethan McDaniel

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE, PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North, Suite 1700

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#15

#14

12 #3

Exhibit Proposed Order

12 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (USDC - Northern District of AL)

12 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Alabama)

#12

11 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Supreme Court of Alabama)

#10

#9

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A State Court Documents

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Strike #19 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Accordia Life and Annuity Company, filed by Gennie Hill.(Henderson, Jocelyn) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 6/20/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr; Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 6/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr.; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/03/2022. (jam) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following ddls/scheds were established: join parties & amending pleadings for pltf ddl 05/19/21 & 06/16/21 for deft; ADR/Mediation ddl 02/14/22; complete all discovery 01/31/22; expert disclosure for pltf ddl 12/02/21 and 12/22/21 for deft; supplementation ddl 12/31/21; document production, interrogatories, & requests for admissions ddl 01/31/22; dispositive motions ddl 02/28/22; Jury Trial set Monday, 06/20/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (est. 2 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 06/10/2022 at 10:00 A.M.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 06/03/2022. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 05/13/21. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#16) MINUTES: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 05/13/2021 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr.; Jocelyn V. Henderson appeared for the pltf; James E. McDaniel appeared for the deft. Proposed scheduling order adopted. The following ddls/scheds were established: join parties & amending pleadings for pltf ddl 05/19/21 & 06/16/21 for deft; ADR/Mediation ddl 02/14/22; complete all discovery 01/31/22; expert disclosure for pltf ddl 12/02/21 and 12/22/21 for deft; supplementation ddl 12/31/21; document production, interrogatories, & requests for admissions ddl 01/31/22; dispositive motions ddl 02/28/22; Jury Trial set Monday, 06/20/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (est. 2 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 06/10/2022 at 10:00 A.M.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 06/03/2022. (Court Reporter: Tina Gibson) (jam) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James Ethan McDaniel. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 5/4/2021. (Entered: 5/4/2021) (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua R. Hess. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 5/4/2021. (Entered 5/4/2021) (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3601054) by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Alabama), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (USDC - Northern District of AL), #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(McDaniel, James) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Proposed Order Submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3601029) by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Supreme Court of Alabama), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (USDC - Northern District of AL), #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SETTING LETTER: A TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference is set for 5/13/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (der) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/19/2021) (der). (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Accordia Life and Annuity Company Civil Cover Sheet (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer failed to include a civil cover sheet with the notice of removal. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by Accordia Life and Annuity Company.(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Accordia Life and Annuity Company from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-0765-21 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3589444), filed by Accordia Life and Annuity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents)(Wahlheim, William) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accordia Life and Annuity Company is a litigant