This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 11:01:03 (UTC).

Hill et al v. Town of Valley Brook et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 Hill filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Town of Valley Brook. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kiara McCorkle

Kimiesha Hill

Jason Garnett

Defendants

Lewis Nieman

Stephen Haynes

Valley Brook Police Department

Michael Stamp

Town of Valley Brook

Valley Brook Municipal Court

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Woodrow K Glass

Attorney at Ward & Glass LLP

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

Defendant Attorneys

Courtney Jo Davis Powell

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - OKC

9400 N Broadway Extension, Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Anthony J Ferate

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - OKC

9400 N Broadway Extension, Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Andrew W Lester

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - OKC

9400 N Broadway Extension, Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

Shannon F Davies

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - OKC

9400 N Broadway Extension, Suite 600

Oklahoma City, OK 73114-7423

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #2

Exhibit Request for PHV supplement

19 #1

Exhibit Request for Admission PHV

#19

18 #1

Exhibit Request for Admission PHV

#18

#17

14 #1

Exhibit Request for Admission PHV

1 #18

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Exhibit 17- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #16

Exhibit 16- Return of Summons

1 #15

Exhibit 15- Return of Summons

1 #14

Exhibit 14- Return of Summons

1 #13

Exhibit 13- Motion to Associate Counsel

1 #11

Exhibit 11- Motion to Associate Counsel

1 #4

Exhibit Order

#1

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #18 and #19 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Tianna Mays and Arthur Ago are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs, Kimiesha Hill, Jason Garnett, Kiara McCorkle, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, provided each counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 4/8/2021. (ks) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #17 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are permitted to file a supplemental brief, which does not exceed ten (10) pages, within the seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 4/7/2021. (ks) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arthur Ago Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3658166 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit Request for PHV supplement)(Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tianna Mays Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3658160 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission PHV)(Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Reply Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #11 , #12 , #13 and #14 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Laura Gavin, Lisa Swaminathan, Jason A. Leckerman and Izabella Babchinetskaya are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Plaintiffs Kimiesha Hill, Jason Garnett, Kiara McCorkle, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated, provided each counsel submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 4/5/2021. (ks) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Powell, Courtney) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Izabella Babchinetskaya Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3652222 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission PHV)(Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason Leckerman Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3652213 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission PHV)(Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lisa Swaminathan Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-3652202 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Request for Admission PHV)(Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply by All Defendants. (Powell, Courtney) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Powell, Courtney) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Class Action Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to plead or otherwise respond to the Amended Class Action Complaint is extended an additional seven (7) days from the current deadline. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 2/22/2021. (ks) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Class Action Complaint by All Defendants. (Powell, Courtney) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Courtney Jo Davis Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Courtney) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony J Ferate on behalf of All Defendants (Ferate, Anthony) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Lester on behalf of All Defendants (Lester, Andrew) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3590613. (Powell, Courtney) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2021-67 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Motion to Seal Plaintiff's Complaint, #4 Exhibit Order, #5 Exhibit 5- Amended Class Action Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6- Proof of Service Stamp, #7 Exhibit 7- Proof of Service Haynes, #8 Exhibit 8- Prof of Service Nieman, #9 Exhibit 9- Motion to Associate Counsel, #10 Exhibit 10- Certificate of Compliance, #11 Exhibit 11- Motion to Associate Counsel, #12 Exhibit 12- Motion to Associate Counsel, #13 Exhibit 13- Motion to Associate Counsel, #14 Exhibit 14- Return of Summons, #15 Exhibit 15- Return of Summons, #16 Exhibit 16- Return of Summons, #17 Exhibit 17- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #18 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) Modified on 2/10/2021 (dtb). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Woodrow K Glass