This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:52 (UTC).

HILL et al v. ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by HILL against ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17061

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Mark Falk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOUGLAS HILL

EUNICE HILL

Defendants

PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ASTRAZENECA LP

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

In Re

PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912317) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EUNICE HILL, DOUGLAS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY & PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY on 8/29/2019 by DOUGLAS HILL, EUNICE HILL. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2019. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION on 8/29/2019 by DOUGLAS HILL, EUNICE HILL. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2019. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP & ASTRAZENECA LP on 8/29/2019 by DOUGLAS HILL, EUNICE HILL. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2019. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY JOSEPH HINDY on behalf of ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION (HINDY, GREGORY) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY & PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY on 8/29/2019 by DOUGLAS HILL, EUNICE HILL. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2019. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION on 8/29/2019 by DOUGLAS HILL, EUNICE HILL. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2019. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP & ASTRAZENECA LP on 8/29/2019 by DOUGLAS HILL, EUNICE HILL. Waiver of Service due by 10/28/2019. (SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Member Case Direct File on 8/22/2019, for MDL 17-2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (lag, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • For all Case Management Orders #click here (lag, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912317) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EUNICE HILL, DOUGLAS HILL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.