Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 08:05:49 (UTC).

Hill #699324 v. Matthews et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Hill 699324 filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Matthews. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff, Ellen S. Carmody and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00853

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judges

Ellen S. Carmody

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvester Hill #699324

Freeland, MI 48623

Defendants

S. Harris

N. Nagy

T. Chrisman

B. Morrison

J. Brawley

W. Matthews

Unknown Cook

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents returned to Sylvester Hill #699324 (clw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for order to show cause for a preliminary injunction by plaintiff Sylvester Hill #699324; (clw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (ems) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.72 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

5 #1

MDOC Legal Mail form

#5

(#5) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Sylvester Hill #699324; (Attachments: #1 MDOC Legal Mail form) (mlc) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

4 #2

Financial Documents

4 #1

Declaration

#4

(#4) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Sylvester Hill #699324; (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Financial Documents) (slk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (sjc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#2

(#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 11/21/2019 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (jal) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #1

Exhibits A-E

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against J. Brawley, T. Chrisman, Unknown Cook, S. Harris, W. Matthews, B. Morrison, N. Nagy filed by Sylvester Hill #699324 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E) (jlg) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents returned to Sylvester Hill #699324 (clw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for order to show cause for a preliminary injunction by plaintiff Sylvester Hill #699324; (clw) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (ems) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Sylvester Hill #699324 (ns) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.72 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Sylvester Hill #699324; (Attachments: #1 MDOC Legal Mail form) (mlc) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Sylvester Hill #699324; (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Financial Documents) (slk) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (ESC), #3 sent via U.S. Mail to pltf Hill (krv) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (sjc) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Deficiency Order #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Sylvester Hill #699324 (clw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 11/21/2019 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (jal) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against J. Brawley, T. Chrisman, Unknown Cook, S. Harris, W. Matthews, B. Morrison, N. Nagy filed by Sylvester Hill #699324 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E) (jlg) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less