This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 08:15:22 (UTC).

Hile et al v. Michigan, State of et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Hile filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00829

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JILL HILE

JOSEPH HILE

JESSIE BAGOS

RYAN BAGOS

SAMANTHA JACOKES

PHILLIP JACOKES

NICOLE LEITCH

JASON LEITCH

MICHELLE LUPANOFF

GEORGE LUPANOFF

PARENT ADVOCATES FOR CHOICE IN EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Defendants

State of Michigan

Gretchen E. Whitmer

Rachael Eubanks

Michigan, State of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John J. Bursch

Attorney at Bursch Law PLLC

9339 Cherry Valley Se, #78

Caledonia, MI 49316

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M. Allen

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Solicitor General)

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30212

Lansing, MI 48909

Linus Richard Banghart-Linn

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Solicitor General)

525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30212

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Rachael Eubanks, State of Michigan, Gretchen E. Whitmer (mg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/1/2021 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/24/2021 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by defendants Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Michigan, State of served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Gretchen E. Whitmer served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Rachael Eubanks served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by defendants Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer; (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#13

(#13) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #12 filed by Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #13 filed by Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #12 filed by Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #12 filed by Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #13 filed by Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim #12 filed by Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and failure to state a claim by defendants Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer; (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting STIPULATION #7 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS returned executed; Rachael Eubanks served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed; Gretchen E. Whitmer served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Michigan, State of served on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by defendants Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 12/1/2021 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/24/2021 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Christopher M. Allen on behalf of defendants Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Allen, Christopher) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Linus Richard Banghart-Linn on behalf of defendants Rachael Eubanks, Michigan, State of, Gretchen E. Whitmer (Banghart-Linn, Linus) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Rachael Eubanks, State of Michigan, Gretchen E. Whitmer (mg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bursch, John) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parent Advocates for Choice in Education Foundation (Bursch, John) Modified text on 9/24/2021 (mg). (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Phillip Jacokes, Parent Advocates for Choice in Education Foundation, Jessie Bagos, Nicole Leitch, Michelle Lupanoff, Joseph Hile, Jason Leitch, Ryan Bagos, Jill Hile, George Lupanoff, Samantha Jacokes in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6550035 (Bursch, John) Modified text on 9/24/2021 (mg). (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Phillip Jacokes, Parent Advocates for Choice in Education Foundation, Jessie Bagos, Nicole Leitch, Michelle Lupanoff, Joseph Hile, Jason Leitch, Ryan Bagos, Jill Hile, George Lupanoff, Samantha Jacokes (Bursch, John) Modified text on 9/24/2021 (mg). (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less