This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2020 at 08:17:38 (UTC).

Hilda Munoz et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Hilda Munoz filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01640

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Guillermo Munoz

Hilda Munoz

Defendant

American Medical Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

William M Moreland

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Scott A Love

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Clayton A Clark

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Kathryn Grace Hooten

Attorney at Clark Love and Hutson GP

440 Louisiana Street Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77002

Adam Daniel Peavy

Attorney at Clark, Love & Hutson, PLLC

440 Louisiana St., Ste 1700, Houston

Houston, TX 77002

Paul R Kiesel

Attorney at Kiesel Law LLP

8648 Wilshire Boulevard

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2910

Defendant Attorneys

Michael J. Farrell

Attorney at Farrell White and Legg

Po Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Barbara R. Binis

Attorney at Reed Smith

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Erik W Legg

Attorney at Farrell White and Legg

P O Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Barbara R Binis

Attorney at Reed Smith

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street Suite 3100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

David E Stanley

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#74

#73

#72

71 #1

Proposed Order

#71

#70

#69

68 #1

Proposed Order

#68

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Michael J. Farrell on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee n/a. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Erik W Legg on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee n/a. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc.. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara R. Binis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2020, Receipt No. 25645306) #71 (Stanley, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara R. Binis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 3/6/2020, Receipt No. 25645306) filed by defendant American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stanley, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara R. Binis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25645109) #68 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara R. Binis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. and designating David E. Stanley as local counsel #68 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barbara R. Binis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant American Medical Systems, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25645109) filed by defendant American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stanley, David) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott A. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Munoz, Hilda Munoz and designating Paul R Kiesel as local #66 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott A. Love to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Guillermo Munoz, Hilda Munoz (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-25606558) filed by Plaintiffs Guillermo Munoz, Hilda Munoz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kiesel, Paul) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Adam D. Peavy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Hilda Munoz and Guillermo Munoz, designating Paul R. Kiesel as local counsel #60 . (iv) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL AMS Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive") (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2325 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2325 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases on inactive docket). (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and American Medical Systems have reached a settlement with regard to AMS. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and AMS may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 5/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4369 in MDL Case No. 2325 AMS. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/5/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Guillermo Munoz, Hilda Munoz. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Guillermo Munoz, Hilda Munoz. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRETRIAL ORDER # 223 (Order re: Production of Case-Specific Information For Certain AMS MDL Plaintiffs) It is directed as follows: A) Existing Cases pending as of October 10, 2016. This order applies to certain cases in MDL 2325 alleging claim(s) against AMS, as of 10/10/2016, and listed on Exhibit A. B) Plaintiff Fact Sheets, Authorizations and Documents. Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A shall submit a full and complete PFS with verifications and the attached authorizations and the other documents identified herein to the individuals identified in Paragraph C by 11/21/2016, as more fully set forth herein. D) This PTO does not in any way relieve plaintiffs from their obligation to serve a Plaintiff Profile Form; and E) Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2016. (cc: Clerk of JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 10/21/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 01/11/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 203 (Order re: Qualified Settlement Fund Astora Women's Health, Inc. (fka American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.), et al. and Levin Papantonio) entered on 12/22/2015 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4300189. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/21/2020.] (Entered: 12/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathryn Grace Hooten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam D. Peavy