On November 12, 2021, Higuchi International Corporation d/b/a Higuchi manufacturing America, (“Higuchi” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Todd A. Holleman of Miller of Canfield, Paddock and Stone P.L.C., filed a contract lawsuit against Autoliv ASP, INC., (“Autoliv” or “Defendant”), seeking damages for the Defendant’s alleged breach of contract. This case was filed in U.S. District court in the Eastern District of Michigan with Judge David R. Grand and Judge Paul D. Borman presiding.
In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Higuchi and Autoliv are parties to a long-term supply agreement under which Higuchi agreed to sell to Autoliv and Autoliv agreed to purchase from Higuchi stamped steel parts required by Autoliv or its affiliated entities to build automotive components subject to applicable terms and conditions.” The Plaintiff then alleged that, “Higuchi and Autoliv are also parties to a raw materials agreement (“RMA”) under which the parties agreed to a mechanism to quarterly set the price Autoliv would pay Higuchi for the steel Higuchi purchased to manufacture Autoliv’s parts subject to the terms and conditions.”
The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Based on Autoliv’s forecasts, Higuchi would purchase the steel necessary to manufacture the forecasted quantity of parts at least three months in advance and pay the price charged for the steel at that time. Autoliv’s forecasts were inaccurate leaving Higuchi with excess steel inventory that when used to satisfy later orders will be priced at an amount lower than what Higuchi paid.”
Plaintiff further alleged that, “Due to circumstances beyond its reasonable control, Higuchi can no longer meet what Autoliv has asserted are Higuchi’s obligations under the LTA and the terms of the RMA should be adjusted or set aside. Higuchi has tried to negotiate a resolution and sustainable way to move forward but Autoliv has refused to negotiate toward such a result.”
Plaintiff then alleged that, “Higuchi has and will continue to incur significant unanticipated costs beyond its reasonable control making it impossible to meet Autoliv’s requirements caused by (a) Steel shortages and Autoliv delays in negotiating with Coil Plus and approving alternate steel suppliers; (b) Inconsistent and unpredictable Autoliv forecasting and ordering; (c) Autoliv’s failure to provide promised revenue and profits through increased sales growth; (d) An unanticipated increase in raw material steel prices. Higuchi is unable to comply with Autoliv’s unrealistic demands, which are contrary to the parties’ contract and fail to recognize the relief under the LTA and RMA afforded to Higuchi under these circumstances.”
There are two claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for declaratory relief over the application of the force majeure provision in Article 26 of the Terms and Conditions as applied to the LTA, RMA and Autoliv’s demands. The second claim alleged is for commercial impracticality wherein the Plaintiff alleged that the current manufacturing environment experiencing with the effects of the Covid-19 pandemic makes it impossible for Higuchi to meet the purported LTA obligations that Autoliv seeks to impose on it or accept the RMA pricing.
In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to award judgment in favor of Higuchi, relieving it of its purported obligations under the LTA under UCC 2-165 and to adjust or set aside the RMA.
This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.
2:21-CV-12795
11/30/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Other Contract
Paul D. Borman
David R. Grand
Higuchi International Corporation
Higuchi Manufacturing Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V.
Autoliv ASP, Inc.
Todd A. Holleman
Christopher R. Struble
Michael R. Turco
(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Higuchi International Corporation against Autoliv ASP, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8706228 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bexar - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Long Term Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit 3 - Raw Materials Agreement) (Holleman, Todd) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
Index of Exhibits
Exhibit 1 - Long Term Supply Agreement
Exhibit 2 - Terms and Conditions
Exhibit 3 - Raw Materials Agreement
(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Autoliv ASP, Inc.* (KBro) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Autoliv ASP, Inc. against Higuchi International Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Autoliv ASP, Inc. against Higuchi International Corporation by Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Autoliv ASP, Inc. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Turco on behalf of Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Struble on behalf of Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Struble, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 12/28/2021; Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2021 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
(#8) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Higuchi Manufacturing Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V.* (TTho) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
(#9) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Higuchi International Corporation. (Holleman, Todd) (Entered: 12/24/2021)
(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Higuchi Manufacturing Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
(#11) Joint Rule 26 Plan REPORT by Higuchi International Corporation (Holleman, Todd) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/31/2023 - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 10/31/2022; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/31/2023 - Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DTof) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketTEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2021 is Cancelled (DTof) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) Joint Rule 26 Plan REPORT by Higuchi International Corporation (Holleman, Todd) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Higuchi Manufacturing Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. served on 12/28/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/28/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) ANSWER to Third Party Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses by Higuchi International Corporation. (Holleman, Todd) (Entered: 12/24/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS Issued for *Higuchi Manufacturing Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V.* (TTho) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
[-] Read LessDocketREQUEST for THIRD-PARTY SUMMONS for Higuchi Manufacturing Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: DISCOVERY PLAN DUE 12/28/2021; Scheduling Conference set for 12/29/2021 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul D. Borman *READ ENTIRE NOTICE FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION* (DTof) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Struble on behalf of Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Struble, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Turco on behalf of Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Autoliv ASP, Inc. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by Autoliv ASP, Inc. against Higuchi International Corporation, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Autoliv ASP, Inc. against Higuchi International Corporation by Autoliv ASP, Inc.. (Turco, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Autoliv ASP, Inc.* (KBro) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Higuchi International Corporation against Autoliv ASP, Inc.. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8706228 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Bexar - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Long Term Supply Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Terms and Conditions, #4 Exhibit 3 - Raw Materials Agreement) (Holleman, Todd) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
[-] Read Less