This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2022 at 07:42:08 (UTC).

Hightower v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 Hightower filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Hightower

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Wells Fargo & Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brianne Thomas

Attorney at Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish LLC-Independence

221 W. Lexington, Suite 200

Independence, MO 64051

Erica Mae Fumagalli

Attorney at Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish LLC-Independence

221 W. Lexington, Suite 200

Independence, MO 64051

Joshua A. Sanders

Attorney at Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish LLC-Independence

221 W. Lexington, Suite 200

Independence, MO 64051

Mark Everett Parrish

Attorney at Boyd Kenter Thomas & Parrish LLC-Independence

221 W. Lexington, Suite 200

Independence, MO 64051

Defendant Attorneys

David M Mangian

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP - StL

One Us Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

Steven Shredl

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

Saint Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to withdraw document #15 MOTION for extension of time Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Request to Withdraw the Motion for Extension of Time filed by David M Mangian on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Reply suggestions due by 1/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#18

(#18) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #15 MOTION for extension of time filed by David M Mangian on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Reply suggestions due by 1/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION to withdraw document #15 MOTION for extension of time filed by Joshua A. Sanders on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Sanders, Joshua) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION for extension of time filed by Erica Mae Fumagalli on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fumagalli, Erica) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#13

(#13) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/13/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/27/2022. Signed on 12/13/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#12

(#12) SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#11

(#12) SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#9

(#14) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' motion #9 to compel arbitration and motion #11 to dismiss were due on December 20, 2021. On or before December 31, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his responses to Defendants' motions or shall otherwise show cause as to why Defendants' requested relief should not be granted. Signed on 12/23 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of appearance by David M Mangian on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attorney David M Mangian added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David M Mangian added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Mangian, David) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Steven Shredl on behalf of All Defendants (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

2 #1

Notice of Removal

2 #2

Main Document

1 #4

Exhibit D (SEC Form T-1)

1 #3

Exhibit C (Civil Cover Sheet)

1 #2

Exhibit B (State Court Notice)

1 #1

Exhibit A (State Court Docket and Pleadings)

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #17 MOTION to withdraw document #15 MOTION for extension of time Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Request to Withdraw the Motion for Extension of Time filed by David M Mangian on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Reply suggestions due by 1/27/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #15 MOTION for extension of time filed by David M Mangian on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Reply suggestions due by 1/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Mangian, David) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to withdraw document #15 MOTION for extension of time filed by Joshua A. Sanders on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Sanders, Joshua) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #15 on or before January 6, 2022. Signed on 1/4/22 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for extension of time filed by Erica Mae Fumagalli on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fumagalli, Erica) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' motion #9 to compel arbitration and motion #11 to dismiss were due on December 20, 2021. On or before December 31, 2021, Plaintiff shall file his responses to Defendants' motions or shall otherwise show cause as to why Defendants' requested relief should not be granted. Signed on 12/23 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/13/2022. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/27/2022. Signed on 12/13/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the entry filed on 12/6/21 as Document No. 13, The entry has been deleted as it was filed in the incorrect case. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUGGESTIONS in support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Richardson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Richardson (Retail Installment Sale Contract), #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of R. Richardson (Assignment Agreement))(Related document(s) #9 ) (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time. Defendant's answer or responsive pleading is due on or before December 6, 2021. Signed on 11/19/21 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/3/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of appearance by David M Mangian on behalf of Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attorney David M Mangian added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney David M Mangian added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Mangian, David) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Steven Shredl on behalf of All Defendants (Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Defendants Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-cv22026, Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7672702. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Docket and Pleadings), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Notice), #3 Exhibit C (Civil Cover Sheet), #4 Exhibit D (SEC Form T-1))(Shredl, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Shredl

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Mangian