This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 09:08:16 (UTC).

Hightower Holding, LLC v. Gibson

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 Hightower Holding, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gibson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00307

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hightower Holding, LLC

Defendant

John Gibson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Charles Herr

Attorney at Law Office of Daniel C. Herr LLC

1225 North King Street, Suite 1000

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

John H Newcomer, Jr.

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Cortlan S. Hitch

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Ave, Ste 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Number 2022-0086 LWW (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3820018)- filed by John Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by John Gibson.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit 1 and 2 in Support of Motion for Remand

4 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John Gibson. (Newcomer, John) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Prayer for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Related to its Motion to Remand by Hightower Holding, LLC re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #5 Response to Motion (Herr, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/3/2022. (nmf) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#8

(#8) Letter to Clerk, New Castle County Court of Chancery from Deputy Clerk, U.S.D.C. enclosing certified copy of Order of Remand and certified copy of U.S.D.C. docket sheet. - re #7 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (nmf) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter to Clerk, New Castle County Court of Chancery from Deputy Clerk, U.S.D.C. enclosing certified copy of Order of Remand and certified copy of U.S.D.C. docket sheet. - re #7 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (nmf) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/3/2022. (nmf) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Prayer for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Related to its Motion to Remand by Hightower Holding, LLC re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #5 Response to Motion (Herr, Daniel) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by John Gibson. (Newcomer, John) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court - filed by Hightower Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2 in Support of Motion for Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herr, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by John Gibson.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware, Case Number 2022-0086 LWW (Filing fee $402, receipt number ADEDC-3820018)- filed by John Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortlan S. Hitch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Laurence Dorsney