This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 09:00:37 (UTC).

Hightex USA, LLC v. EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Hightex USA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Hightex USA, LLC

Talisman Casualty Insurance Company LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven G. Hall

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, P.C.-Atl

Suite 1600, Monarch Plaza, 3414 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-1164

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Douglas Lee Tabeling

Attorney at Smith Currie & Hancock LLP

245 Peachtree Center Avenue, Suite 2700, Marquis One Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303-1227

William L. Baggett, Jr.

Attorney at Smith Currie & Hancock, LLP-Atl

2700 Marquis One Tower, 245 Peachtree Center Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30303-1227

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Electronic Summons Issued as to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company LLC. (jkb) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons by EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators. (Tabeling, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

7 #1

Summons on Counterclaim to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 9/23/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Hightex USA, LLC, Talisman Casualty Insurance Company LLC with Jury Demand by EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Counterclaim to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC)(Tabeling, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hightex USA, LLC. EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators waiver mailed on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Hall, Steven) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#5

(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on March 5, 2021. (ash) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#3

(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21.(jkb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Tiberio Esparza, Registered Agent (EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators). (jkb) Modified on 3/4/2021 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Hightex USA, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10790643) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/4/2021 to edit text. (jkb). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Summons Issued as to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company LLC. (jkb) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons by EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators. (Tabeling, Douglas) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 9/23/2021.), COUNTERCLAIM against Hightex USA, LLC, Talisman Casualty Insurance Company LLC with Jury Demand by EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators. (Attachments: #1 Summons on Counterclaim to Talisman Casualty Insurance Company, LLC)(Tabeling, Douglas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hightex USA, LLC. EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators waiver mailed on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Hall, Steven) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on March 5, 2021. (ash) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21.(jkb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Tiberio Esparza, Registered Agent (EW Corporation Industrial Fabricators). (jkb) Modified on 3/4/2021 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Hightex USA, LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10790643) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/4/2021 to edit text. (jkb). (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Talisman Casualty Insurance Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven G. Hall