This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2019 at 07:48:30 (UTC).

Highland Capital Management LP et al v. Acis Capital Management LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Highland Capital Management LP filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Acis Capital Management LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane J. Boyle and Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01477

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jane J. Boyle

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Appellant

Highland Capital Management LP

Appellees and Debtors

Acis Capital Management LP

Acis Capital Management GP LLC

Winstead PC

Not Classified By Court

Case Admin Support

Stacey G Jernigan

Dallas, TX 75242-1496

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Holland Neff O'Neil

Attorney at Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Jason Bradley Binford

Attorney at Foley Gardere, Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Melina Niaz Bales

Attorney at Foley Gardere

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Appellee and Debtor Attorneys

Rakhee V Patel

Attorney at Winstead PC

2728 N. Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

Joseph J Wielebinski

Attorney at Winstead PC

2728 N. Harwood Street, Ste. 500

Dallas, TX 75201

Phillip Lewis Lamberson

Attorney at Winstead PC

500 Winstead Building, 2728 N Harwood Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Annmarie Antoniette Chiarello

Attorney at Winstead PC

2728 North Harwood Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Notice of appeal and supporting documentation

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Acis Capital Management GP LLC, Acis Capital Management LP. (Chiarello, Annmarie) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Related Case filed by Highland Capital Management LP (Binford, Jason) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Highland Capital Management LP. (Binford, Jason) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Phillip Lewis Lamberson on behalf of Winstead PC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lamberson, Phillip) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rakee V Patel on behalf of Winstead PC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wielebinski, Joseph) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (mla). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph J Wielebinski on behalf of Winstead PC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wielebinski, Joseph) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Annmarie Antoniette Chiarello on behalf of Winstead PC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Chiarello, Annmarie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/25/2019) (epm) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (mla) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-30264 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:19-cv-1477. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal and supporting documentation) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACIS Capital Management LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Highland Capital Management, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holland Neff O'Neil