This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2020 at 09:47:22 (UTC).

Higgins v. Vellender et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Higgins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Vellender. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Andrew P Rodovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Higgins

Defendants

Peoples Auto Sales

Sabrina Vellender

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Massa

6122 W 45Th Street

Gary, IN 46408

Defendant Attorney

Renee J Mortimer

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Hi/IN

2211 Main St Ste 3-2A

Highland, IN 46322

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Peoples Auto Sales.(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER: The Court ORDERS Attorney Massa to show proof of reinstatement by the Indiana Supreme Court by 5/20/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/6/20. (Copy mailed to Attorney Massa). (nal) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

7 #2

Exhibit B - Consent to Notice of Removal

7 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#7

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Peoples Auto Sales. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Notice of Removal)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#8

(#8) Mail Returned from Michael J Massa as Undeliverable - 4 Order. Resent to current address on docket. (jat) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The defendant will be afforded an opportunity to establish that the court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The defendant is ORDERED to file an amended notice of removal properly alleging the jurisdictional amount in controversy by 5/1/2020. The defendant is WARNED that a failure to comply with the deadline set out in this Order will result in remand of this action to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/17/2020. (bas) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#5

(#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Peoples Auto Sales ; answer due by May 19, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Peoples Auto Sales (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4199861.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D10-1804-CT-0074, filed by Peoples Auto Sales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff to file a status report by 6/22/2020 to advise status on service of process on Defendant Sabrina Vellender. Alternatively, Plaintiff may electronically file proposed summons for issuance. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/9/2020. Text entry only. cc: Massa (tc) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docket***Deadline to Amend terminated. (mrm) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Peoples Auto Sales.(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: The Court ORDERS Attorney Massa to show proof of reinstatement by the Indiana Supreme Court by 5/20/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/6/20. (Copy mailed to Attorney Massa). (nal) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Peoples Auto Sales. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Notice of Removal)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Mail Returned from Michael J Massa as Undeliverable - 4 Order. Resent to current address on docket. (jat) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The defendant will be afforded an opportunity to establish that the court has subject matter jurisdiction over this case. The defendant is ORDERED to file an amended notice of removal properly alleging the jurisdictional amount in controversy by 5/1/2020. The defendant is WARNED that a failure to comply with the deadline set out in this Order will result in remand of this action to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/17/2020. (bas) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer deadline reset to 5/19/2020 for Peoples Auto Sales pursuant to DE #5 . (shk) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Peoples Auto Sales ; answer due by May 19, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/16/2020. (tc) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (bas) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Peoples Auto Sales (Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4199861.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D10-1804-CT-0074, filed by Peoples Auto Sales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less