This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 08:45:08 (UTC).

Higgins v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 Higgins filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capital One Bank USA , N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca Grady Jennings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00743

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ollie F. Higgins

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Synchrony Bank

Citibank, N.A.

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Onemain Financial Services, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

American Express Company

Bank of America, N.A.

TransUnion, LLC

Webbank, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Hemminger

Attorney at Hemminger Law Office, PSC

331 Townepark Cir., Suite 100-C

Louisville, KY 40243

Defendant Attorneys

Margaret Jane Brannon

Attorney at Jackson Kelly, PLLC - Lexington

100 West Main Street, Suite 700

Lexington, KY 40507

Maxwell D. Smith

Attorney at Ward Hocker & Thornton, PLLC - Lexington

333 W. Vine Street, Suite 1100

Lexington, KY 40507

J. Tanner Watkins

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 2500

Louisville, KY 40202

W. Scott Stinnett

Attorney at Lloyd & McDaniel, PLC

P.O. Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

Brian M. Bennett

Attorney at Stites & Harbison, PLLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202-3352

Sandra D. Jansen

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

26 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order

#26

#25

#19

#6

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Summons tendered

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Synchrony Bank. (Smith, Maxwell) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/29/2020 granting #29 Proposed Agreed Order. BANA shall have through and including 2/1/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Proposed Agreed Order Further Extending Bank of America, N.A.'s Response by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bennett, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/21/2020 granting #25 Proposed Agreed Order. American Express shall have an extension, of up to and including 1/22/2021, in which to file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/21/2020 granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Citibank be, and hereby is, granted an extension of time up to and including Friday, 1/15/2021 in which to file a response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. cc: Counsel (DLW) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Citibank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order) (Watkins, J.) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Proposed Agreed Order Amended Agreed Order by American Express Company. (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/8/2020 granting #18 Proposed Agreed Order. The Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall have up to and including 1/7/2021 in which to file a responsive pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Webbank, Inc. COMPLETED on 12/7/2020. Secretary of State return states 11/13/2020. (SMJ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. COMPLETED on 12/7/2020. Secretary of State return states 11/23/2020. (SMJ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Bennett, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America, N.A. by Bank of America, N.A. (Bennett, Brian) Modified on 12/1/2020, affiliate added (SMJ). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AGREED ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 11/30/2020 granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Synchrony Bank shall have up to and including 1/4/2021 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by American Express Company. (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Stinnett on behalf of American Express Company (Stinnett, W.) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying corporate parent Synchrony Financial, by Synchrony Bank. (Smith, Maxwell) Modified on 11/24/2020, party added (SMJ). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Synchrony Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time) (Smith, Maxwell) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to American Express Company, Bank of America, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Onemain Financial Services, Inc., Synchrony Bank, TransUnion, LLC, and Webbank, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. Attested copy of Complaint emailed to counsel. (SRH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT, filed by Ollie F. Higgins, against American Express Company, Bank of America, N.A., Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Citibank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Onemain Financial Services, Inc., Synchrony Bank, TransUnion, LLC, and Webbank, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3221267. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEBBANK is a litigant

Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant