Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/27/2021 at 09:14:10 (UTC).

Higgins v. Allstate Insurance Co

Case Summary

On April 28, 2021, Cynthia Higgins (“Plaintiff”), represented by Catharine Biggs of Long & Long (Mobile), filed a contract lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company (“Defendant”), seeking monetary damages, for alleged breach of contract and failure to tender adequate insurance claim proceeds which caused contractual, consequential, and tort damages to the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Louisiana with Judges James D. Cain, Jr. and Kathleen Kay presiding. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “Plaintiff purchased a Homeowner’s Policy (hereinafter, “the Policy”) from Defendant to insure his home and the contents therein against physical damage by or from wind and hurricane. The Policy was in full force and effect at all relevant times and Plaintiff paid all premiums when due. Hurricane Laura caused substantial damage to the Property. The high winds and debris impacted the roof, roof structure and exterior of the property, and caused several storm created openings that allowed wind, rain, and debris to enter. Once Plaintiff discovered the Property damage, Plaintiff made an immediate claim to Defendant. The Property became uninhabitable during the time reasonably necessary to repair or replace the damaged property. The Defendant failed to pay the necessary additional living expenses which are covered under the Policy.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant unfairly and improperly persisted in denying payment on the full amount of Plaintiff’s claim after receiving satisfactory proof of loss. Upon information and belief, Defendant misrepresented to Plaintiff the terms and conditions of the Policy. Upon information and belief, Defendant conducted its loss investigation and claims handling process for Plaintiff in bad faith. Upon information and belief, Defendant conducted its loss investigation and claims handling process for Plaintiff in violation of its obligations under the Policy.”

 

The Plaintiff lists out two claims for relief in the complaint. The first claim is for alleged breach of contract and it has been claimed by the Plaintiff that despite having received sufficient proof of loss, Defendant failed to timely tender adequate claim payments due under the Policy. Defendant failed to perform and materially breached the insurance contract when it wrongly failed to pay Plaintiff for damages to the property that the Policy covered. The second claim is for alleged violation of La. R.S. §§ 22:1973 and 22:1892 and it has been claimed by the Plaintiff that the Defendant’s failure to promptly, fairly and fully investigate Plaintiff for the covered losses under the Policy was arbitrary, capricious, and without probable cause and Defendant’s failure to pay timely for damages Defendant knew or should have known existed—after Defendant’s initial inspection of the Property and after Defendant received Plaintiff’s proof of loss and estimate of damages—was in violation of La. R.S. §§ 22:1892 and 22:1973.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to deliver judgment for such amounts as Plaintiff may prove at trial by jury, including the full amount of the building property damage at Replacement Cost Value; reimbursement for additional living expenses; all actual and consequential damages; applicable penalties under La. R.S. § 22:1892 and La. R.S. § 1973, along with all attorney fees and litigation expenses.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01135

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Higgins

Defendants

Allstate Insurance Company

Allstate Insurance Co

Special Masters

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Catharine Biggs

Attorney at Long & Long (Mobile)

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr N

Mobile, AL 36608

Andrea Faye Butler

Attorney at Long & Long (Mobile)

3600 Springhill Memorial Dr N

Mobile, AL 36608

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Dunn Hotard

Attorney at Salley Hite et al

365 Canal St Ste 1710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephannie M England

Attorney at Salley Hite et al

365 Canal St Ste 1710

New Orleans, LA 70130

John W Hite, III

Attorney at Salley Hite et al

365 Canal St Ste 1710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Stephen Charles Resor

Attorney at Salley Hite et al

365 Canal St Ste 1710

New Orleans, LA 70130

Special Master Attorneys

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Higgins. Allstate Insurance Co served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings L L C, Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,Resor, Stephen) Modified on 6/15/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allstate Insurance Co.(Attorney Stephen Charles Resor added to party Allstate Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Resor, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

4 #2

Certificate of good standing

4 #1

Proposed order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4701821) by Cynthia Higgins. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) Modified to correct signature date on 4/28/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4656208) filed by Cynthia Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Catharine Biggs added to party Cynthia Higgins(pty:pla))(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Higgins. Allstate Insurance Co served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings L L C, Corporate Parent Allstate Corp for Allstate Insurance Co. (aty,Resor, Stephen) Modified on 6/15/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Allstate Insurance Co.(Attorney Stephen Charles Resor added to party Allstate Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Resor, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Andrea Faye Butler for Cynthia Higgins. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/11/2021. (crt,Higgins, M) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Andrea Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4701821) by Cynthia Higgins. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) Modified to correct signature date on 4/28/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allstate Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4656208) filed by Cynthia Higgins. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Catharine Biggs added to party Cynthia Higgins(pty:pla))(aty,Biggs, Catharine) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant